FL H1077 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on December 29 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-03-14 - Died on Second Reading Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on December 29 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-03-14 - Died on Second Reading Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Provides certain areas are at risk due to sea level rise & structures & infrastructure within those areas are potentially at risk.
Title
Public Financing of Potentially At-risk Structures and Infrastructure
Sponsors
House State Affairs Committee | Rep. Christine Hunschofsky [D] | Rep. James Buchanan [R] | Rep. Dotie Joseph [D] |
Roll Calls
2022-02-21 - House - House State Affairs Committee (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-02-14 - House - House Agriculture & Natural Resources Appropriations Subcommittee (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-02-14 - House - House Agriculture & Natural Resources Appropriations Subcommittee (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-02-14 - House - House Agriculture & Natural Resources Appropriations Subcommittee (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-01-25 - House - House Environment, Agriculture & Flooding Subcommittee (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-01-25 - House - House Environment, Agriculture & Flooding Subcommittee (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-02-14 - House - House Agriculture & Natural Resources Appropriations Subcommittee (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-02-14 - House - House Agriculture & Natural Resources Appropriations Subcommittee (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-02-14 - House - House Agriculture & Natural Resources Appropriations Subcommittee (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-01-25 - House - House Environment, Agriculture & Flooding Subcommittee (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-01-25 - House - House Environment, Agriculture & Flooding Subcommittee (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-14 | House | Died on Second Reading Calendar |
2022-03-12 | House | Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration |
2022-02-24 | House | Added to Second Reading Calendar |
2022-02-24 | House | Bill referred to House Calendar |
2022-02-22 | House | 1st Reading (Committee Substitute 1) |
2022-02-22 | House | CS Filed |
2022-02-22 | House | Laid on Table under Rule 7.18(a) |
2022-02-22 | House | Reported out of State Affairs Committee |
2022-02-21 | House | Favorable with CS by State Affairs Committee |
2022-02-17 | House | Added to State Affairs Committee agenda |
2022-02-14 | House | Now in State Affairs Committee |
2022-02-14 | House | Reported out of Agriculture & Natural Resources Appropriations Subcommittee |
2022-02-14 | House | Favorable by Agriculture & Natural Resources Appropriations Subcommittee |
2022-02-10 | House | Added to Agriculture & Natural Resources Appropriations Subcommittee agenda |
2022-01-25 | House | Now in Agriculture & Natural Resources Appropriations Subcommittee |
2022-01-25 | House | Reported out of Environment, Agriculture & Flooding Subcommittee |
2022-01-25 | House | Favorable by Environment, Agriculture & Flooding Subcommittee |
2022-01-21 | House | Added to Environment, Agriculture & Flooding Subcommittee agenda |
2022-01-11 | House | 1st Reading (Original Filed Version) |
2022-01-10 | House | Now in Environment, Agriculture & Flooding Subcommittee |
2022-01-10 | House | Referred to State Affairs Committee |
2022-01-10 | House | Referred to Agriculture & Natural Resources Appropriations Subcommittee |
2022-01-10 | House | Referred to Environment, Agriculture & Flooding Subcommittee |
2021-12-29 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S1434 (Same As) 2022-03-14 - Died in Appropriations
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
161 | 551 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
380 | 0937 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |