FL H1065 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 13 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-06-13 - Chapter No. 2014-139
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 13 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-06-13 - Chapter No. 2014-139
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Requires applicant for licensure under chapter 480, F.S., to submit to certain fingerprinting requirements; requires DOH to issue emergency order suspending license of massage therapist or establishment & to deny application for certain persons with specified interests in establishment for certain offenses; requires Board to deny application for new or renewal massage therapy licenses for certain offenses; requires applicant for massage therapist license & certain persons with specified interests in establishment to submit to certain background screening requirements by specified date; authorizes department to adopt rules related to corporate assets.
Title
Licensed Massage Therapists
Sponsors
House Health Quality Subcommittee | Rep. Dave Kerner [D] | Rep. Kathleen Peters [R] | Rep. Clovis Watson [D] |
Rep. Carl Zimmerman [D] |
Roll Calls
2014-04-29 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RCS#16 (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-25 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#747 (Y: 117 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-25 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#747 (Y: 117 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-06-13 | Chapter No. 2014-139 | |
2014-06-13 | Approved by Governor | |
2014-06-05 | Signed by Officers and presented to Governor | |
2014-04-29 | House | Ordered enrolled |
2014-04-29 | Senate | CS passed; YEAS 38 NAYS 0 |
2014-04-29 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2014-04-28 | Senate | Placed on 3rd reading |
2014-04-28 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2014-04-28 | Senate | Substituted for CS/SB 1068 |
2014-04-28 | Senate | Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading |
2014-04-28 | Senate | Withdrawn from Health Policy; Appropriations |
2014-04-25 | Senate | Received |
2014-04-25 | Senate | Referred to Health Policy; Appropriations |
2014-04-25 | Senate | In Messages |
2014-04-25 | House | CS passed as amended; YEAS 117 NAYS 0 |
2014-04-25 | House | Amendment(s) adopted (259951) |
2014-04-25 | House | Read 3rd time |
2014-04-24 | House | Placed on 3rd reading |
2014-04-24 | House | Read 2nd time |
2014-04-22 | House | Placed on Special Order Calendar, 04/24/14 |
2014-04-10 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2014-04-10 | House | Favorable by- Health and Human Services Committee; YEAS 16 NAYS 1 |
2014-04-08 | House | On Committee agenda-- Health and Human Services Committee, 04/10/14, 9:00 am, Morris Hall |
2014-04-02 | House | Now in Health and Human Services Committee |
2014-04-02 | House | Favorable by Justice Appropriations Subcommittee; YEAS 12 NAYS 0 |
2014-03-31 | House | On Committee agenda-- Justice Appropriations Subcommittee, 04/02/14, 8:00 am, Morris Hall |
2014-03-24 | House | Now in Justice Appropriations Subcommittee |
2014-03-24 | House | CS referred to Justice Appropriations Subcommittee; Health and Human Services Committee |
2014-03-24 | House | Original reference(s) removed: Health Care Appropriations Subcommittee |
2014-03-20 | House | CS by Health Quality Subcommittee read 1st time |
2014-03-20 | House | Pending review of CS under Rule 7.19(c) |
2014-03-18 | House | CS by Health Quality Subcommittee; YEAS 12 NAYS 0 |
2014-03-14 | House | On Committee agenda-- Health Quality Subcommittee, 03/18/14, 3:00 pm, 306 HOB |
2014-03-05 | House | Referred to Health Quality Subcommittee; Health Care Appropriations Subcommittee; Health and Human Services Committee |
2014-03-04 | House | Introduced |
2014-02-21 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S1068 (Similar To) 2014-04-28 - Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/HB 1065 (Ch. 2014-139)
H1063 (Similar To) 2014-05-02 - Died in Health Quality Subcommittee, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/HB 1065 (Ch. 2014-139)
H1063 (Similar To) 2014-05-02 - Died in Health Quality Subcommittee, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/HB 1065 (Ch. 2014-139)
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
456 | 0135 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
456 | 074 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
480 | 041 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
480 | 043 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
480 | 0465 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |