FL H1063 | 2014 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on May 2 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-05-02 - Died in Health Quality Subcommittee, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/HB 1065 (Ch. 2014-139)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Suspends massage establishment license or individual massage license if licensee is charged with specified crimes; provides for termination of suspension if charges are no longer pending; provides that suspension remains in effect upon conviction pending disciplinary action by Board of Massage Therapy; provides for restoration of license if charge is nolle prosequied or dismissed or person is acquitted; provides for extension of term of restored license for certain period.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Massage Practice

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2014-05-02HouseDied in Health Quality Subcommittee, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/HB 1065 (Ch. 2014-139)
2014-03-05HouseReferred to Health Quality Subcommittee; Criminal Justice Subcommittee; Health and Human Services Committee
2014-03-04HouseIntroduced
2014-02-21HouseFiled

Same As/Similar To

S1068 (Similar To) 2014-04-28 - Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/HB 1065 (Ch. 2014-139)
H1065 (Similar To) 2014-06-13 - Chapter No. 2014-139

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
4800464Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback