FL H1063 | 2016 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Passed on March 24 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-03-24 - Chapter No. 2016-97, companion bill(s) passed, see HB 1061 (Ch. 2016-139)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Provides exemption from public records requirements for certain information held by DOH or Board of Nursing pursuant to Nurse Licensure Compact; provides exemption from public meeting requirements for certain meetings of Interstate Commission of Nurse Licensure Compact Administrators; provides exemption from public records requirements for recordings, minutes, & records generated during closed portions of such meetings; provides for future legislative review & repeal of exemptions; provides statement of public necessity; provides for contingent effect.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Public Records and Meetings/Nurse Licensure Compact

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2016-03-04 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RCS#34 (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-02 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#666 (Y: 112 N: 2 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2016-03-24 Chapter No. 2016-97, companion bill(s) passed, see HB 1061 (Ch. 2016-139)
2016-03-24 Approved by Governor
2016-03-09 Signed by Officers and presented to Governor
2016-03-04HouseOrdered enrolled
2016-03-04SenatePassed; YEAS 38 NAYS 0
2016-03-04SenateRead 3rd time
2016-03-03SenatePlaced on 3rd reading
2016-03-03SenateRead 2nd time
2016-03-03SenateSubstituted for CS/SB 1306
2016-03-03SenatePlaced on Calendar, on 2nd reading
2016-03-03SenateWithdrawn from Health Policy; Governmental Oversight and Accountability; Rules
2016-03-02SenateReceived
2016-03-02SenateReferred to Health Policy; Governmental Oversight and Accountability; Rules
2016-03-02SenateIn Messages
2016-03-02HousePassed as amended; YEAS 112 NAYS 2
2016-03-02HouseRead 3rd time
2016-03-01HousePlaced on 3rd reading
2016-03-01HouseAmendment(s) adopted (174853)
2016-03-01HouseRead 2nd time
2016-02-26HousePlaced on Special Order Calendar, 03/01/16
2016-01-27HousePlaced on Calendar
2016-01-27HouseFavorable by- Health and Human Services Committee; YEAS 16 NAYS 1
2016-01-25HouseOn Committee agenda-- Health and Human Services Committee, 01/27/16, 9:00 am, Morris Hall
2016-01-20HouseNow in Health and Human Services Committee
2016-01-20HouseFavorable by Government Operations Subcommittee; YEAS 11 NAYS 0
2016-01-15HouseOn Committee agenda-- Government Operations Subcommittee, 01/20/16, 9:00 am, Webster Hall
2016-01-12HouseIntroduced
2016-01-11HouseNow in Government Operations Subcommittee
2016-01-11HouseFavorable by Select Committee on Affordable Healthcare Access; YEAS 11 NAYS 0
2016-01-04HouseOn Committee agenda-- Select Committee on Affordable Healthcare Access, 01/11/16, 1:30 pm, Sumner Hall
2015-12-29HouseReferred to- Select Committee on Affordable Healthcare Access; Government Operations Subcommittee; Health and Human Services Committee
2015-12-29HouseOriginal reference(s) removed: Health Care Appropriations Subcommittee
2015-12-29HouseReferred to Select Committee on Affordable Healthcare Access; Health Care Appropriations Subcommittee; Health and Human Services Committee
2015-12-29HouseFiled

Same As/Similar To

H1061 (Related) 2016-03-28 - Chapter No. 2016-139, companion bill(s) passed, see HB 1063 (Ch. 2016-97)
S1306 (Same As) 2016-03-03 - Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see HB 1063 (Ch. 2016-97), HB 1061 (Ch. 2016-139)
S1316 (Similar To) 2016-03-08 - Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see HB 1061 (Ch. 2016-139), HB 1063 (Ch. 2016-97)

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
4640096Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback