FL H1055 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Passed on March 22 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-22 - Chapter No. 2018-64
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Provides exemption from public records requirements for certain identifying & location information of current or former directors, managers, supervisors, nurses, & clinical employees of addiction treatment facility, & the spouses & children thereof; provides for future legislative review & repeal of exemption; provides for retroactive application; provides statement of public necessity.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Pub. Rec./Addiction Treatment Facility Personnel

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-03-07 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RCS#15 (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-21 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#646 (Y: 105 N: 9 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-03-22 Chapter No. 2018-64
2018-03-21 Approved by Governor
2018-03-14 Signed by Officers and presented to Governor
2018-03-07HouseOrdered enrolled
2018-03-07SenateCS passed; YEAS 36 NAYS 0 848
2018-03-07SenateRead 3rd time
2018-03-06SenatePlaced on 3rd reading
2018-03-06SenateRead 2nd time
2018-03-06SenateSubstituted for CS/SB 1364
2018-03-06SenatePlaced on Calendar, on 2nd reading
2018-03-06SenateWithdrawn from Health Policy; Governmental Oversight and Accountability; Rules
2018-02-28SenateReceived
2018-02-28SenateReferred to Health Policy; Governmental Oversight and Accountability; Rules
2018-02-28SenateIn Messages
2018-02-21HouseCS passed; YEAS 105 NAYS 9
2018-02-21HouseRead 3rd time
2018-02-20HousePlaced on 3rd reading
2018-02-20HouseRead 2nd time
2018-02-15HousePlaced on Special Order Calendar, 02/20/18
2018-02-01HousePlaced on Calendar
2018-02-01HouseFavorable by- Health and Human Services Committee; YEAS 17 NAYS 0
2018-01-30HouseOn Committee agenda-- Health and Human Services Committee, 02/01/18, 9:30 am, Morris Hall
2018-01-26HouseNow in Health and Human Services Committee
2018-01-25HouseCS by Oversight, Transparency and Administration Subcommittee read 1st time
2018-01-25HousePending review of CS under Rule 7.18(c)
2018-01-23HouseCS by Oversight, Transparency and Administration Subcommittee; YEAS 12 NAYS 0
2018-01-19HouseOn Committee agenda-- Oversight, Transparency and Administration Subcommittee, 01/23/18, 3:30 pm, Morris Hall
2018-01-17HouseNow in Oversight, Transparency and Administration Subcommittee
2018-01-17HouseFavorable by Children, Families and Seniors Subcommittee; YEAS 13 NAYS 0
2018-01-12HouseOn Committee agenda-- Children, Families and Seniors Subcommittee, 01/17/18, 8:30 am, 12 HOB
2018-01-09HouseIntroduced
2018-01-03HouseReferred to Children, Families and Seniors Subcommittee; Oversight, Transparency and Administration Subcommittee; Health and Human Services Committee
2017-12-21HouseFiled

Same As/Similar To

S1364 (Similar To) 2018-03-06 - Laid on Table, refer to CS/HB 1055

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
119071Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback