FL S1364 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on December 22 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-03-06 - Laid on Table, refer to CS/HB 1055
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on December 22 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-03-06 - Laid on Table, refer to CS/HB 1055
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Providing an exemption from public records requirements to certain identifying and location information of current or former directors, managers, supervisors, nurses, and clinical employees of substance abuse service providers that are licensed under part II of ch. 397, F.S., and the spouses and children thereof; providing for future legislative review and repeal of the exemption; providing a statement of public necessity, etc.
Title
Public Records/Substance Abuse Service Providers
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-06 | Senate | Laid on Table, refer to CS/HB 1055 |
2018-03-06 | Senate | Substituted CS/HB 1055 |
2018-03-06 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2018-03-02 | Senate | Placed on Special Order Calendar, 03/06/18 |
2018-03-02 | Senate | Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading |
2018-03-01 | Senate | Favorable by- Rules; YEAS 12 NAYS 0 |
2018-02-28 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Rules, 03/01/18, 9:00 am, 412 Knott Building |
2018-02-20 | Senate | Now in Rules |
2018-02-20 | Senate | Favorable by Governmental Oversight and Accountability; YEAS 5 NAYS 0 |
2018-02-15 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Governmental Oversight and Accountability, 02/20/18, 1:30 pm, 401 Senate Office Building |
2018-02-15 | Senate | Now in Governmental Oversight and Accountability |
2018-02-14 | Senate | CS by Health Policy read 1st time |
2018-02-14 | Senate | Pending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute) |
2018-02-13 | Senate | CS by Health Policy; YEAS 7 NAYS 1 |
2018-02-08 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Health Policy, 02/13/18, 10:00 am, 412 Knott Building |
2018-01-11 | Senate | Introduced |
2018-01-11 | Senate | Referred to Health Policy; Governmental Oversight and Accountability; Rules |
2017-12-22 | Senate | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H1055 (Similar To) 2018-03-22 - Chapter No. 2018-64