FL H1055 | 2017 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Failed on May 5 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-05 - Died in Commerce Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Revises definition of "development" to exclude certain utility work on rights-of-way or corridors & creation or termination of distribution & transmission corridors; requires DEP to consider certain variance standard for certification of power plants & transmission corridors; specifies PSC authority to locate transmission lines underground.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Linear Facilities

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2017-05-05HouseDied in Commerce Committee
2017-05-05HouseIndefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
2017-03-20HouseNow in Commerce Committee
2017-03-20HouseFavorable by Natural Resources and Public Lands Subcommittee; YEAS 14 NAYS 1
2017-03-16HouseOn Committee agenda-- Natural Resources and Public Lands Subcommittee, 03/20/17, 12:00 pm, 12 HOB
2017-03-15HouseNow in Natural Resources and Public Lands Subcommittee
2017-03-15HouseFavorable by Energy and Utilities Subcommittee; YEAS 14 NAYS 0
2017-03-13HouseOn Committee agenda-- Energy and Utilities Subcommittee, 03/15/17, 9:00 am, Webster Hall
2017-03-07HouseIntroduced
2017-03-06HouseReferred to Energy and Utilities Subcommittee; Natural Resources and Public Lands Subcommittee; Commerce Committee
2017-02-27HouseFiled

Same As/Similar To

S1048 (Same As) 2017-05-05 - Died in Messages

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
1633221Amended CodeSee Bill Text
38004Amended CodeSee Bill Text
403511Amended CodeSee Bill Text
403531Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback