FL H1047 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 6-2-1)
Status: Passed on May 23 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-05-23 - Chapter No. 2023-110
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 6-2-1)
Status: Passed on May 23 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-05-23 - Chapter No. 2023-110
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Prohibits offering or doing violence to police horse or police canine in certain circumstances; increases classification of specified criminal offenses committed against police canines, fire canines, SAR canines, or police horses.
Title
Offenses Against Certain Animals
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-05-01 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RCS#19 (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-26 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#246 (Y: 116 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-19 - House - House Judiciary Committee (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2023-04-11 - House - House Justice Appropriations Subcommittee (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-03-29 - House - House Criminal Justice Subcommittee (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-04-26 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#246 (Y: 116 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-19 - House - House Judiciary Committee (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2023-04-11 - House - House Justice Appropriations Subcommittee (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-03-29 - House - House Criminal Justice Subcommittee (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-05-23 | Chapter No. 2023-110 | |
2023-05-23 | Approved by Governor | |
2023-05-22 | Signed by Officers and presented to Governor | |
2023-05-01 | House | Ordered enrolled |
2023-05-01 | House | In Messages |
2023-05-01 | Senate | CS passed; YEAS 39 NAYS 0 |
2023-05-01 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2023-05-01 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2023-05-01 | Senate | Substituted for SB 1300 |
2023-05-01 | Senate | Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading |
2023-05-01 | Senate | Withdrawn from Rules |
2023-04-26 | Senate | Received |
2023-04-26 | Senate | Referred to Rules |
2023-04-26 | Senate | In Messages |
2023-04-26 | House | CS passed; YEAS 116, NAYS 0 |
2023-04-26 | House | Read 3rd time |
2023-04-25 | House | Added to Third Reading Calendar |
2023-04-25 | House | Placed on 3rd reading |
2023-04-25 | House | Read 2nd time |
2023-04-20 | House | Bill added to Special Order Calendar (4/25/2023) |
2023-04-20 | House | Added to Second Reading Calendar |
2023-04-20 | House | Bill referred to House Calendar |
2023-04-19 | House | 1st Reading (Committee Substitute 1) |
2023-04-19 | House | CS Filed |
2023-04-19 | House | Laid on Table under Rule 7.18(a) |
2023-04-19 | House | Reported out of Judiciary Committee |
2023-04-19 | House | Favorable with CS by Judiciary Committee |
2023-04-17 | House | Added to Judiciary Committee agenda |
2023-04-11 | House | Now in Judiciary Committee |
2023-04-11 | House | Reported out of Justice Appropriations Subcommittee |
2023-04-11 | House | Favorable by Justice Appropriations Subcommittee |
2023-04-06 | House | Added to Justice Appropriations Subcommittee agenda |
2023-03-29 | House | Now in Justice Appropriations Subcommittee |
2023-03-29 | House | Reported out of Criminal Justice Subcommittee |
2023-03-29 | House | Favorable by Criminal Justice Subcommittee |
2023-03-27 | House | Added to Criminal Justice Subcommittee agenda |
2023-03-07 | House | 1st Reading (Original Filed Version) |
2023-02-28 | House | Now in Criminal Justice Subcommittee |
2023-02-28 | House | Referred to Judiciary Committee |
2023-02-28 | House | Referred to Justice Appropriations Subcommittee |
2023-02-28 | House | Referred to Criminal Justice Subcommittee |
2023-02-22 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S1300 (Similar To) 2023-05-01 - Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/HB 1047 (Ch. 2023-110)
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
843 | 01 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
843 | 19 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
921 | 0022 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |