FL H1041 | 2022 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on December 27 2021 - 25% progression
Action: 2022-01-11 - 1st Reading (Original Filed Version)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Revises provisions relating to taxation in the state including taxpayer records; notices of rule development; administrative proceedings; transferring real property; audits of taxpayers; legal presumption relating to failure of taxpayer to produce documents requested by subpoena; tax exemptions; subpoena procedures; taxpayer liability for penalties; calculation of penalties; requests to settle or compromise; tolling period for filing claims for refunds; employer reemployment assistance contribution rate calculation.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Tax Administration

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2022-01-11House1st Reading (Original Filed Version)
2022-01-07HouseNow in Ways & Means Committee
2022-01-07HouseReferred to Appropriations Committee
2022-01-07HouseReferred to Ways & Means Committee
2021-12-27HouseFiled

Same As/Similar To

H685 (Similar To) 2022-01-24 - PCS added to State Affairs Committee agenda
S1382 (Similar To) 2022-01-18 - Introduced

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
101194Amended CodeSee Bill Text
12080Amended CodeSee Bill Text
20102Amended CodeSee Bill Text
20234Amended CodeSee Bill Text
20236Amended CodeSee Bill Text
20614Amended CodeSee Bill Text
2069931Amended CodeSee Bill Text
211125Amended CodeSee Bill Text
21205Amended CodeSee Bill Text
21208Amended CodeSee Bill Text
21213Amended CodeSee Bill Text
21214Amended CodeSee Bill Text
213051Amended CodeSee Bill Text
21306Amended CodeSee Bill Text
21321Amended CodeSee Bill Text
21334Amended CodeSee Bill Text
213345Amended CodeSee Bill Text
21367Amended CodeSee Bill Text
220183Amended CodeSee Bill Text
22042Amended CodeSee Bill Text
220735Amended CodeSee Bill Text
2880001Amended CodeSee Bill Text
2900056Amended CodeSee Bill Text
290007Amended CodeSee Bill Text
377809Amended CodeSee Bill Text
443131Amended CodeSee Bill Text
443171Amended CodeSee Bill Text
6245105Amended CodeSee Bill Text
624515Amended CodeSee Bill Text
72011Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback