FL H1037 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Failed on May 3 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-03 - Died in PreK-12 Innovation Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Revises requirements for standard high school diploma; creates Florida Seal of Civic Engagement Program & nonpartisan civic literacy projects; authorizes inclusion of nonpartisan civic literacy projects in certain programs & activities; provides for designation of certain schools as Democracy Schools; provides that earning Seal of Civic Engagement demonstrates competency in civic literacy for specified purposes; revises school grades components.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Civic Education

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-03HouseDied in PreK-12 Innovation Subcommittee
2019-05-03HouseIndefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
2019-03-05HouseIntroduced
2019-03-04HouseReferred to PreK-12 Innovation Subcommittee; PreK-12 Appropriations Subcommittee; Education Committee
2019-02-22HouseFiled

Same As/Similar To

S1316 (Same As) 2019-05-03 - Died in Appropriations Subcommittee on Education

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
10034282Amended CodeSee Bill Text
10034321Amended CodeSee Bill Text
1003497Amended CodeSee Bill Text
10034971Amended CodeSee Bill Text
1003632Amended CodeSee Bill Text
100725Amended CodeSee Bill Text
100834Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback