FL S1316 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on May 3 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-03 - Died in Appropriations Subcommittee on Education
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]

Summary

Revising the requirements for a standard high school diploma to include a specified course; establishing the Florida Seal of Civic Engagement Program; providing that a nonpartisan civic literacy project may be included in service-learning programs, activities, or policies; authorizing certain students to complete a nonpartisan civic literacy project; providing that earning the Seal of Civic Engagement demonstrates competency in civic literacy for specified purposes, etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Civic Education

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-03SenateDied in Appropriations Subcommittee on Education
2019-05-03SenateIndefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
2019-03-26SenateCS by Education read 1st time
2019-03-25SenateNow in Appropriations Subcommittee on Education
2019-03-20SenatePending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute)
2019-03-19SenateCS by Education; YEAS 8 NAYS 0
2019-03-14SenateOn Committee agenda-- Education, 03/19/19, 4:00 pm, 412 Knott Building
2019-03-05SenateIntroduced
2019-03-04SenateReferred to Education; Appropriations Subcommittee on Education; Appropriations
2019-02-22SenateFiled

Same As/Similar To

H1037 (Same As) 2019-05-03 - Died in PreK-12 Innovation Subcommittee

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
10034282Amended CodeSee Bill Text
10034321Amended CodeSee Bill Text
1003497Amended CodeSee Bill Text
10034971Amended CodeSee Bill Text
1003632Amended CodeSee Bill Text
100725Amended CodeSee Bill Text
100834Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback