FL H1033 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on March 14 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-14 - Died in Civil Justice & Property Rights Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on March 14 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-14 - Died in Civil Justice & Property Rights Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Revises process & requirements for levying and appealing fines & suspensions, including requiring certain written notices & hearings & creating appeals committee; authorizes parties to initiate nonbinding arbitration rather than presuit mediation for certain disputes; creates Office of Homeowners' Association Ombudsman within DBPR; provides for funding of office; directs Governor to appoint ombudsman; prohibits ombudsman, officers, & full-time employees from engaging in certain activities or receiving certain remuneration; provides for principal location of ombudsman's office; provides powers & duties of ombudsman; provides for powers & duties of ombudsman; provides for administration of election monitoring process.
Title
Homeowners' Associations
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-01-20 - House - House Regulatory Reform Subcommittee (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-14 | House | Died in Civil Justice & Property Rights Subcommittee |
2022-03-12 | House | Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration |
2022-01-25 | House | Now in Civil Justice & Property Rights Subcommittee |
2022-01-25 | House | Referred to Commerce Committee |
2022-01-25 | House | Referred to State Administration & Technology Appropriations Subcommittee |
2022-01-25 | House | Referred to Civil Justice & Property Rights Subcommittee |
2022-01-24 | House | 1st Reading (Committee Substitute 1) |
2022-01-21 | House | CS Filed |
2022-01-21 | House | Laid on Table under Rule 7.18(a) |
2022-01-21 | House | Reported out of Regulatory Reform Subcommittee |
2022-01-20 | House | Favorable with CS by Regulatory Reform Subcommittee |
2022-01-18 | House | Added to Regulatory Reform Subcommittee agenda |
2022-01-11 | House | 1st Reading (Original Filed Version) |
2022-01-07 | House | Now in Regulatory Reform Subcommittee |
2022-01-07 | House | Referred to Commerce Committee |
2022-01-07 | House | Referred to State Administration & Technology Appropriations Subcommittee |
2022-01-07 | House | Referred to Civil Justice & Property Rights Subcommittee |
2022-01-07 | House | Referred to Regulatory Reform Subcommittee |
2021-12-27 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S1296 (Similar To) 2022-03-14 - Died in Regulated Industries
H6103 (Similar To) 2022-03-14 - Died in Civil Justice & Property Rights Subcommittee
S1364 (Similar To) 2022-03-14 - Died in Regulated Industries
H6103 (Similar To) 2022-03-14 - Died in Civil Justice & Property Rights Subcommittee
S1364 (Similar To) 2022-03-14 - Died in Regulated Industries
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
720 | 305 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
720 | 311 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
720 | 319 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |