FL H1031 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Passed on June 27 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-27 - Chapter No. 2017-180
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Passed on June 27 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-27 - Chapter No. 2017-180
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Ranks & revises description of criminal violations of Marine Turtle Protection Act in offense severity ranking chart of Criminal Punishment Code.
Title
Marine Turtle Protection
Sponsors
Rep. Thad Altman [R] | Rep. Larry Ahern [R] | Rep. Randy Fine [R] | Rep. Jeanette Nunez [R] |
Rep. Elizabeth Porter [R] | Rep. Holly Raschein [R] |
Roll Calls
2017-05-05 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RCS#23 (Y: 36 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-04-26 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#255 (Y: 117 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-26 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#255 (Y: 117 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-06-27 | Chapter No. 2017-180 | |
2017-06-26 | Approved by Governor | |
2017-06-14 | Signed by Officers and presented to Governor | |
2017-05-05 | House | Ordered enrolled |
2017-05-05 | Senate | Passed; YEAS 36 NAYS 2 |
2017-05-05 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2017-05-03 | Senate | Placed on 3rd reading |
2017-05-03 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2017-05-03 | Senate | Substituted for SB 1228 |
2017-05-03 | Senate | Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading |
2017-05-03 | Senate | Withdrawn from Criminal Justice; Environmental Preservation and Conservation; Appropriations |
2017-04-26 | Senate | Received |
2017-04-26 | Senate | Referred to Criminal Justice; Environmental Preservation and Conservation; Appropriations |
2017-04-26 | Senate | In Messages |
2017-04-26 | House | Passed; YEAS 117 NAYS 0 |
2017-04-26 | House | Read 3rd time |
2017-04-25 | House | Placed on 3rd reading |
2017-04-25 | House | Read 2nd time |
2017-04-20 | House | Placed on Special Order Calendar, 04/25/17 |
2017-04-19 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2017-04-19 | House | Favorable by- Government Accountability Committee; YEAS 23 NAYS 0 |
2017-04-17 | House | On Committee agenda-- Government Accountability Committee, 04/19/17, 8:00 am, Morris Hall |
2017-03-21 | House | Now in Government Accountability Committee |
2017-03-21 | House | Favorable by Criminal Justice Subcommittee; YEAS 8 NAYS 0 |
2017-03-17 | House | On Committee agenda-- Criminal Justice Subcommittee, 03/21/17, 12:30 pm, Sumner Hall |
2017-03-14 | House | Now in Criminal Justice Subcommittee |
2017-03-14 | House | Favorable by Natural Resources and Public Lands Subcommittee; YEAS 13 NAYS 0 |
2017-03-10 | House | On Committee agenda-- Natural Resources and Public Lands Subcommittee, 03/14/17, 2:00 pm, 12 HOB |
2017-03-07 | House | Introduced |
2017-03-06 | House | Referred to Natural Resources and Public Lands Subcommittee; Criminal Justice Subcommittee; Government Accountability Committee |
2017-02-24 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S1228 (Similar To) 2017-05-03 - Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see HB 1031 (Ch. 2017-180)