FL H1027 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Passed on June 25 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-25 - Chapter No. 2019-126
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Requires OEL to develop certain training & course standards for school readiness program providers; provides requirements for such training & standards; requires such training & standards to be integrated into certain preservice and inservice training requirements.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Office of Early Learning

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-05-01 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RCS#21 (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-04-11 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#93 (Y: 115 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-06-25 Chapter No. 2019-126
2019-06-24 Approved by Governor
2019-06-13 Signed by Officers and presented to Governor
2019-05-01HouseOrdered enrolled
2019-05-01SenatePassed; YEAS 39 NAYS 0
2019-05-01SenateRead 3rd time
2019-04-30SenatePlaced on 3rd reading
2019-04-30SenateRead 2nd time
2019-04-30SenateSubstituted for SB 1456
2019-04-30SenatePlaced on Calendar, on 2nd reading
2019-04-30SenateWithdrawn from Education; Appropriations Subcommittee on Education; Appropriations
2019-04-22SenateReceived
2019-04-18SenateReferred to Education; Appropriations Subcommittee on Education; Appropriations
2019-04-18SenateIn Messages
2019-04-11HousePassed; YEAS 115 NAYS 0
2019-04-11HouseRead 3rd time
2019-04-10HousePlaced on 3rd reading
2019-04-10HouseRead 2nd time
2019-04-04HousePlaced on Special Order Calendar, 04/10/19
2019-03-28HousePlaced on Calendar
2019-03-28HouseFavorable by- Education Committee; YEAS 16 NAYS 0
2019-03-26HouseOn Committee agenda-- Education Committee, 03/28/19, 8:30 am, Reed Hall
2019-03-26HouseNow in Education Committee
2019-03-25HouseFavorable by PreK-12 Appropriations Subcommittee; YEAS 12 NAYS 0
2019-03-21HouseOn Committee agenda-- PreK-12 Appropriations Subcommittee, 03/25/19, 3:00 pm, Reed Hall
2019-03-19HouseNow in PreK-12 Appropriations Subcommittee
2019-03-19HouseFavorable by PreK-12 Innovation Subcommittee; YEAS 14 NAYS 0
2019-03-15HouseOn Committee agenda-- PreK-12 Innovation Subcommittee, 03/19/19, 12:00 pm, Mashburn Hall
2019-03-05HouseIntroduced
2019-03-04HouseReferred to PreK-12 Innovation Subcommittee; PreK-12 Appropriations Subcommittee; Education Committee
2019-02-22HouseFiled

Same As/Similar To

S1456 (Same As) 2019-04-30 - Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see HB 1027 (Ch. 2019-126)

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
100282Amended CodeSee Bill Text
1002995Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback