FL H1023 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on February 25 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-05-07 - Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 25 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-05-07 - Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requires certain certified bargaining agents to recertify as employee organization by specified date.
Title
Labor Organizations
Sponsors
Rep. Matt Gaetz [R] | Rep. Scott Plakon [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-05-07 | Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration | |
2011-03-08 | Introduced -HJ 89 | |
2011-03-03 | Referred to Government Operations Subcommittee; State Affairs Committee -HJ 89 | |
2011-02-25 | Filed |
Code Citations
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2011/1023 |
Text | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2011/1023/BillText/Filed/HTML |