FL H0981 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (? 2-1)
Status: Passed on June 27 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-27 - Chapter No. 2017-176
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (? 2-1)
Status: Passed on June 27 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-27 - Chapter No. 2017-176
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Provides exemption from public records requirements for certain identifying information of complainants & wards held by Department of Elderly Affairs; provides applicability; provides for future legislative review & repeal of exemption; provides statement of public necessity.
Title
Pub. Rec./Department of Elderly Affairs
Sponsors
House Health and Human Services Committee | House Children, Families and Seniors Subcommittee | Rep. Julio Gonzalez [R] |
Roll Calls
2017-05-03 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RCS#20 (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-04-20 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#188 (Y: 115 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-20 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#188 (Y: 115 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-06-27 | Chapter No. 2017-176 | |
2017-06-26 | Approved by Governor | |
2017-06-14 | Signed by Officers and presented to Governor | |
2017-05-03 | House | Ordered enrolled |
2017-05-03 | Senate | CS passed; YEAS 37 NAYS 0 |
2017-05-03 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2017-05-02 | Senate | Placed on 3rd reading |
2017-05-02 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2017-05-02 | Senate | Substituted for SB 1408 |
2017-05-02 | Senate | Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading |
2017-05-02 | Senate | Withdrawn from Children, Families, and Elder Affairs; Governmental Oversight and Accountability; Rules |
2017-04-25 | Senate | Received |
2017-04-25 | Senate | Referred to Children, Families, and Elder Affairs; Governmental Oversight and Accountability; Rules |
2017-04-25 | Senate | In Messages |
2017-04-20 | House | CS passed; YEAS 115 NAYS 0 |
2017-04-20 | House | Read 3rd time |
2017-04-19 | House | Placed on 3rd reading |
2017-04-19 | House | Read 2nd time |
2017-04-18 | House | Placed on Special Order Calendar, 04/19/17 |
2017-04-13 | House | Placed on Special Order Calendar, 04/18/17 |
2017-04-11 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2017-04-07 | House | CS/CS by Health and Human Services Committee read 1st time |
2017-04-07 | House | Pending review of CS -under Rule 7.18(c) |
2017-04-06 | House | CS/CS by- Health and Human Services Committee; YEAS 14 NAYS 1 |
2017-04-04 | House | On Committee agenda-- Health and Human Services Committee, 04/06/17, 8:00 am, Morris Hall |
2017-03-28 | House | Now in Health and Human Services Committee |
2017-03-28 | House | Favorable by Oversight, Transparency and Administration Subcommittee; YEAS 14 NAYS 0 |
2017-03-24 | House | On Committee agenda-- Oversight, Transparency and Administration Subcommittee, 03/28/17, 3:30 pm, Morris Hall |
2017-03-17 | House | Now in Oversight, Transparency and Administration Subcommittee |
2017-03-14 | House | CS by Children, Families and Seniors Subcommittee read 1st time |
2017-03-14 | House | Pending review of CS under Rule 7.18(c) |
2017-03-13 | House | CS by Children, Families and Seniors Subcommittee; YEAS 10 NAYS 0 |
2017-03-09 | House | On Committee agenda-- Children, Families and Seniors Subcommittee, 03/13/17, 2:00 pm, 12 HOB |
2017-03-07 | House | Introduced |
2017-03-01 | House | Referred to Children, Families and Seniors Subcommittee; Oversight, Transparency and Administration Subcommittee; Health and Human Services Committee |
2017-02-23 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S1408 (Similar To) 2017-05-02 - Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/HB 981 (Ch. 2017-176)