FL H0963 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 14 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-14 - Died in Oversight, Transparency and Public Management Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Prohibits use of personal data contained in public records for certain marketing, soliciting, & contact without person's consent; requires operator of certain website or online service to establish designated request address & provide specified notice regarding collection & sale of consumer information; prohibits sale of consumer information upon request of consumer; requires DLA to adopt rules; provides for injunctions & civil penalties.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Consumer Data Privacy

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2020-03-14HouseDied in Oversight, Transparency and Public Management Subcommittee
2020-03-14HouseIndefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
2020-01-14HouseIntroduced
2020-01-03HouseReferred to Oversight, Transparency and Public Management Subcommittee; Civil Justice Subcommittee; State Affairs Committee
2019-12-16HouseFiled

Same As/Similar To

S1670 (Same As) 2020-03-14 - Died in Commerce and Tourism

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
11901Amended CodeSee Bill Text
501062Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback