FL H0959 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on May 2 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-05-02 - Died in Health Innovation Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on May 2 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-05-02 - Died in Health Innovation Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Provides that clinic employing physician whose license is suspended or revoked is subject to administrative & criminal penalties.
Title
Health Care Clinic Act
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-05-02 | House | Died in Health Innovation Subcommittee |
2014-03-04 | House | Introduced |
2014-02-28 | House | Referred to Health Innovation Subcommittee; Criminal Justice Subcommittee; Health Care Appropriations Subcommittee; Health and Human Services Committee |
2014-02-18 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S0746 (Same As) 2014-05-01 - Laid on Table
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
400 | 9905 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
400 | 9935 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2014/959 |
Text | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2014/0959/BillText/Filed/PDF |