FL H0951 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on May 11 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-05-11 - Approved by Governor; Chapter No. 2010-62; companion bill(s) passed, see CS/HB 7069 (Ch. 2010-114)
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on May 11 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-05-11 - Approved by Governor; Chapter No. 2010-62; companion bill(s) passed, see CS/HB 7069 (Ch. 2010-114)
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Requires certain reports to be submitted in automated format; deletes provisions relating to automatic deletion of mental health record under specified conditions from FDLE database for purposes of sale & delivery of firearms & substitutes procedure for judicial relief from firearm disabilities & removal of records; revises provisions relating to Criminal Justice Information Program, etc.
Title
Public Safety [SPSC]
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2010-04-22 - Senate - Senate Roll Call No. 0045 - Passage (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-04-21 - House - House Roll Call No. 0849 - Passage (Y: 114 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-04-21 - House - House Roll Call No. 0849 - Passage (Y: 114 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-05-11 | Approved by Governor; Chapter No. 2010-62; companion bill(s) passed, see CS/HB 7069 (Ch. 2010-114) | |
2010-04-30 | Signed by Officers and presented to Governor -HJ 01700 | |
2010-04-23 | Ordered enrolled -HJ 01032 | |
2010-04-22 | Read 3rd time -SJ 00737; CS passed; YEAS 32 NAYS 0 -SJ 00737 | |
2010-04-21 | In Messages; Received -SJ 00717; Referred to Criminal Justice; Judiciary; Criminal and Civil Justice Appropriations -SJ 00717; Withdrawn from Criminal Justice; Judiciary; Criminal and Civil Justice Appropriations -SJ 00699; Substituted for CS/CS/SB 1974 -SJ 00700; Read 2nd time -SJ 00700 | |
2010-04-21 | Read 3rd time -HJ 00805; CS passed; YEAS 114 NAYS 0 -HJ 00805 | |
2010-04-20 | Placed on Special Order Calendar; Read 2nd time -HJ 00786 | |
2010-04-06 | Favorable by- Criminal & Civil Justice Policy Council; YEAS 12 NAYS 0 -HJ 00610; Placed on Calendar -HJ 00610 | |
2010-04-02 | On Council agenda-- Criminal & Civil Justice Policy Council, 04/06/10, 9:00 am, 404-H | |
2010-03-30 | Now in Criminal & Civil Justice Policy Council -HJ 00425 | |
2010-03-29 | Pending review of CS under Rule 7.20 | |
2010-03-30 | CS read 1st time on 03/30/10 -HJ 00421 | |
2010-03-26 | CS by Criminal & Civil Justice Appropriations (CGHC); YEAS 11 NAYS 0 -HJ 00425 | |
2010-03-24 | On Committee agenda-- Criminal & Civil Justice Appropriations (CGHC), 03/26/10, 8:00 am, Reed Hall | |
2010-03-09 | Favorable by Public Safety & Domestic Security Policy (CCJP); YEAS 13 NAYS 0 -HJ 00259; Now in Criminal & Civil Justice Appropriations (CGHC) -HJ 00259 | |
2010-03-05 | On Committee agenda-- Public Safety & Domestic Security Policy (CCJP), 03/09/10, 8:00 am, 404-H | |
2010-03-02 | Introduced, referred to Public Safety & Domestic Security Policy (CCJP); Criminal & Civil Justice Appropriations (CGHC); Criminal & Civil Justice Policy Council -HJ 00084 | |
2010-02-18 | Referred to Public Safety & Domestic Security Policy (CCJP); Criminal & Civil Justice Appropriations (CGHC); Criminal & Civil Justice Policy Council | |
2010-02-05 | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S1974 (Similar To) 2010-04-21 - Placed on Special Order Calendar; Read 2nd time -SJ 00700; Substituted CS/HB 951 -SJ 00700; Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/HB 951 (Ch. 2010-62), CS/HB 7069 (Ch. 2010-114) -SJ 00700
H7069 (Similar To) 2010-05-27 - Chapter No. 2010-114; companion bill(s) passed, see CS/HB 5401 (Ch. 2010-162)
S2416 (Similar To) 2010-04-30 - Died in Committee on Children, Families, and Elder Affairs, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/HB 951 (Ch. 2010-62), CS/HB 5401 (Ch. 2010-162), CS/HB 7069 (Ch. 2010-114)
S1520 (Similar To) 2010-04-28 - Placed on Special Order Calendar; Read 2nd time -SJ 00959; Amendment(s) adopted (886258, 636420, 348828, 343964) -SJ 00959; Substituted CS/HB 7069 -SJ 00960; Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/HB 7069 (Ch. 2010-114), CS/HB 951 (Ch. 2010-62), CS/HB 5401 (Ch. 2010-162) -SJ 00960
H7069 (Similar To) 2010-05-27 - Chapter No. 2010-114; companion bill(s) passed, see CS/HB 5401 (Ch. 2010-162)
S2416 (Similar To) 2010-04-30 - Died in Committee on Children, Families, and Elder Affairs, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/HB 951 (Ch. 2010-62), CS/HB 5401 (Ch. 2010-162), CS/HB 7069 (Ch. 2010-114)
S1520 (Similar To) 2010-04-28 - Placed on Special Order Calendar; Read 2nd time -SJ 00959; Amendment(s) adopted (886258, 636420, 348828, 343964) -SJ 00959; Substituted CS/HB 7069 -SJ 00960; Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/HB 7069 (Ch. 2010-114), CS/HB 951 (Ch. 2010-62), CS/HB 5401 (Ch. 2010-162) -SJ 00960
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
0790 | 065 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
0943 | 05 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
0943 | 053 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
0943 | 12 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
0943 | 131 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
0943 | 1395 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
0943 | 17 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
0943 | 1755 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
0943 | 32 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |