FL H0943 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Failed on May 3 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-03 - Died in Judiciary Committee, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/HB 7125 (Ch. 2019-167)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Failed on May 3 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-03 - Died in Judiciary Committee, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/HB 7125 (Ch. 2019-167)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Requires each judicial circuit to establish Driver License Reinstatement Days program for reinstating suspended or revoked driver licenses; requires participation by certain entities; provides event scheduling requirements; authorizes waiver of certain fees; provides program eligibility requirements; requires clerks of court & DHSMV to verify information necessary for driver license reinstatement.
Title
Driver License Reinstatement Days
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-03 | House | Died in Judiciary Committee, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/HB 7125 (Ch. 2019-167) |
2019-05-03 | House | Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration |
2019-03-19 | House | Now in Judiciary Committee |
2019-03-18 | House | Favorable by Appropriations Committee; YEAS 28 NAYS 0 |
2019-03-14 | House | On Committee agenda-- Appropriations Committee, 03/18/19, 1:00 pm, Webster Hall |
2019-03-06 | House | Now in Appropriations Committee |
2019-03-05 | House | Favorable by Criminal Justice Subcommittee; YEAS 12 NAYS 0 |
2019-03-05 | House | Introduced |
2019-03-01 | House | On Committee agenda-- Criminal Justice Subcommittee, 03/05/19, 1:30 pm, Sumner Hall |
2019-02-28 | House | Referred to Criminal Justice Subcommittee; Appropriations Committee; Judiciary Committee |
2019-02-20 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H7125 (Similar To) 2019-07-01 - Chapter No. 2019-167, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/HB 1021 (Ch. 2019-91), CS/SB 160 (Ch. 2019-45), CS/SB 828 (Ch. 2019-50), SB 910 (Ch. 2019-61), SB 1136 (Ch. 2019-53), CS/CS/SB 1418 (Ch. 2019-134)
S642 (Similar To) 2019-05-01 - Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/HB 1021 (Ch. 2019-91), HB 5011 (Ch. 2019-95), CS/HB 7125 (Ch. 2019-167), CS/SB 160 (Ch. 2019-45), CS/SB 828 (Ch. 2019-50), SB 910 (Ch. 2019-61), CS/CS/SB 1418 (Ch. 2019-134)
S642 (Similar To) 2019-05-01 - Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/HB 1021 (Ch. 2019-91), HB 5011 (Ch. 2019-95), CS/HB 7125 (Ch. 2019-167), CS/SB 160 (Ch. 2019-45), CS/SB 828 (Ch. 2019-50), SB 910 (Ch. 2019-61), CS/CS/SB 1418 (Ch. 2019-134)
Code Citations
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2019/943 |
Text | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2019/943/BillText/Filed/PDF |