FL H0937 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 7-2)
Status: Introduced on February 23 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-04-23 - Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/SB 644 (Ch. 2015-57), CS/SB 642 (Ch. 2015-56)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 23 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-04-23 - Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/SB 644 (Ch. 2015-57), CS/SB 642 (Ch. 2015-56)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Creates Florida ABLE Trust Fund within State Board of Administration; authorizes sources of funds; specifies purpose of trust fund & authorized uses of assets; provides for future review & termination or re-creation of trust fund; provides for contingent effect.
Title
Trust Funds/Florida ABLE Trust Fund/State Board of Administration
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-04-23 | House | Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/SB 644 (Ch. 2015-57), CS/SB 642 (Ch. 2015-56) |
2015-04-23 | House | Substituted CS/CS/SB 644 |
2015-04-21 | House | Placed on Special Order Calendar, 04/23/15 |
2015-04-01 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2015-04-01 | House | Favorable by- Health and Human Services Committee; YEAS 17 NAYS 0 |
2015-03-30 | House | On Committee agenda-- Health and Human Services Committee, 04/01/15, 8:30 am, Morris Hall |
2015-03-12 | House | Now in Health and Human Services Committee |
2015-03-12 | House | Favorable by Education Appropriations Subcommittee; YEAS 13 NAYS 0 |
2015-03-10 | House | On Committee agenda-- Education Appropriations Subcommittee, 03/12/15, 8:00 am, Morris Hall |
2015-03-05 | House | Now in Education Appropriations Subcommittee |
2015-03-04 | House | Favorable by Children, Families and Seniors Subcommittee; YEAS 12 NAYS 0 |
2015-03-03 | House | Introduced |
2015-03-02 | House | On Committee agenda-- Children, Families and Seniors Subcommittee, 03/04/15, 12:30 pm, Reed Hall |
2015-03-02 | House | Referred to Children, Families and Seniors Subcommittee; Education Appropriations Subcommittee; Health and Human Services Committee |
2015-02-23 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H0935 (Related) 2015-04-23 - Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/SB 642 (Ch. 2015-56), CS/CS/SB 644 (Ch. 2015-57), CS/CS/SB 646 (Ch. 2015-58)
S0644 (Similar To) 2015-05-22 - Chapter No. 2015-57, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/SB 642 (Ch. 2015-56)
S0642 (Similar To) 2015-05-22 - Chapter No. 2015-56, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/SB 644 (Ch. 2015-57), CS/CS/SB 646 (Ch. 2015-58)
S0644 (Similar To) 2015-05-22 - Chapter No. 2015-57, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/SB 642 (Ch. 2015-56)
S0642 (Similar To) 2015-05-22 - Chapter No. 2015-56, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/SB 644 (Ch. 2015-57), CS/CS/SB 646 (Ch. 2015-58)
Code Citations
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2015/937 |
Text | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2015/0937/BillText/Filed/PDF |