FL S0642 | 2015 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum:
Status: Passed on May 22 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-05-22 - Chapter No. 2015-56, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/SB 644 (Ch. 2015-57), CS/CS/SB 646 (Ch. 2015-58)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Creating the "Florida Achieving a Better Life Experience (ABLE) Act"; requiring the Florida Prepaid College Board to establish a direct-support organization known as "Florida ABLE, Inc."; authorizing the organization to use certain services, property, and facilities of the Florida Prepaid College Board; requiring the Agency for Health Care Administration, the Agency for Persons with Disabilities, the Department of Children and Families, and the Department of Education to assist, cooperate, and coordinate with the organization in the provision of public information and outreach for the program, etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Individuals with Disabilities

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2015-04-24 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#280 (Y: 117 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-01 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RCS#35 (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2015-05-22 Chapter No. 2015-56, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/SB 644 (Ch. 2015-57), CS/CS/SB 646 (Ch. 2015-58)
2015-05-21 Approved by Governor
2015-05-07 Signed by Officers and presented to Governor
2015-04-24SenateOrdered enrolled
2015-04-24HouseCS passed; YEAS 117 NAYS 0
2015-04-24HouseRead 3rd time
2015-04-23HousePlaced on 3rd reading
2015-04-23HouseRead 2nd time
2015-04-23HouseSubstituted for CS/HB 935
2015-04-21HouseReceived
2015-04-21HousePlaced on Special Order Calendar, 04/23/15
2015-04-21HouseReferred to Calendar
2015-04-01HouseIn Messages
2015-04-01SenateImmediately certified
2015-04-01SenateCS passed as amended; YEAS 38 NAYS 0
2015-04-01SenateRead 3rd time
2015-04-01SenateAmendment(s) adopted (474044)
2015-04-01SenateRead 2nd time
2015-03-26SenatePlaced on Special Order Calendar, 04/01/15
2015-03-26SenatePlaced on Calendar, on 2nd reading
2015-03-25SenateFavorable by- Appropriations; YEAS 18 NAYS 0
2015-03-20SenateOn Committee agenda-- Appropriations, 03/25/15, 9:00 am, 412 Knott Building
2015-03-05SenateNow in Appropriations
2015-03-04SenateSubcommittee Recommendation: Favorable by Appropriations Subcommittee on Education; YEAS 7 NAYS 0
2015-03-03SenateCS by Banking and Insurance read 1st time
2015-03-03SenateIntroduced
2015-02-27SenateOn Committee agenda-- Appropriations Subcommittee on Education, 03/04/15, 10:00 am, 412 Knott Building
2015-02-20SenateNow in Appropriations Subcommittee on Education
2015-02-18SenatePending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute)
2015-02-17SenateCS by Banking and Insurance; YEAS 11 NAYS 0
2015-02-09SenateOn Committee agenda-- Banking and Insurance, 02/17/15, 9:00 am, 110 Senate Office Building
2015-02-06SenateReferred to Banking and Insurance; Appropriations Subcommittee on Education; Appropriations
2015-02-03SenateFiled

Same As/Similar To

S0644 (Related) 2015-05-22 - Chapter No. 2015-57, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/SB 642 (Ch. 2015-56)
S0646 (Related) 2015-05-22 - Chapter No. 2015-58, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/SB 642 (Ch. 2015-56)
H0935 (Similar To) 2015-04-23 - Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/SB 642 (Ch. 2015-56), CS/CS/SB 644 (Ch. 2015-57), CS/CS/SB 646 (Ch. 2015-58)
H0937 (Similar To) 2015-04-23 - Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/SB 644 (Ch. 2015-57), CS/SB 642 (Ch. 2015-56)
H0939 (Similar To) 2015-04-23 - Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/SB 646 (Ch. 2015-58), CS/SB 642 (Ch. 2015-56)

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
1009971Amended CodeSee Bill Text
1009985Amended CodeSee Bill Text
1009986Amended CodeSee Bill Text
22222Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback