FL H0917 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on May 5 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-05 - Died in Children, Families and Seniors Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on May 5 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-05 - Died in Children, Families and Seniors Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Revises definition "child care facility" to exclude facilities offering programs for children which are owned & operated by county or municipal government.
Title
Child Care Facilities
Sponsors
Rep. Kamia Brown [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-05 | House | Died in Children, Families and Seniors Subcommittee |
2017-05-05 | House | Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration |
2017-03-07 | House | Introduced |
2017-03-01 | House | Referred to Children, Families and Seniors Subcommittee; Local, Federal and Veterans Affairs Subcommittee; Health and Human Services Committee |
2017-02-21 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S0946 (Same As) 2017-05-05 - Died in Children, Families, and Elder Affairs
Code Citations
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2017/917 |
Text | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2017/0917/BillText/Filed/PDF |