FL H0915 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum:
Status: Passed on July 6 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-07-06 - Chapter No. 2021-247
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum:
Status: Passed on July 6 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-07-06 - Chapter No. 2021-247
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Deletes provisions requiring certain persons to execute and deliver a bond within a specified time period after assuming office; revises annual salary of commissioners & revises the term "port manager" to "port director".
Title
Port of Palm Beach District, Palm Beach County
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-04-29 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RCS#23 (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-23 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#289 (Y: 116 N: 1 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-15 - House - House State Affairs Committee (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2021-04-01 - House - House Local Administration & Veterans Affairs Subcommittee (Y: 15 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-04-23 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#289 (Y: 116 N: 1 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-15 - House - House State Affairs Committee (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2021-04-01 - House - House Local Administration & Veterans Affairs Subcommittee (Y: 15 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-07-06 | Chapter No. 2021-247 | |
2021-06-29 | Approved by Governor | |
2021-06-28 | Signed by Officers and presented to Governor | |
2021-04-29 | House | Ordered enrolled |
2021-04-29 | House | In Messages |
2021-04-29 | Senate | CS passed; YEAS 39 NAYS 0 |
2021-04-29 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2021-04-29 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2021-04-29 | Senate | Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading |
2021-04-29 | Senate | Withdrawn from Rules |
2021-04-26 | Senate | Placed on Local Calendar, 04/29/21 |
2021-04-23 | Senate | Received |
2021-04-23 | House | Message sent to senate |
2021-04-23 | Senate | Referred to Rules |
2021-04-23 | Senate | In Messages |
2021-04-23 | House | CS passed; YEAS 116, NAYS 1 |
2021-04-23 | House | Read 3rd time |
2021-04-22 | House | Added to Third Reading Calendar |
2021-04-22 | House | Placed on 3rd reading |
2021-04-22 | House | Read 2nd time |
2021-04-19 | House | Bill added to Special Order Calendar (4/22/2021) |
2021-04-15 | House | Added to Second Reading Calendar |
2021-04-15 | House | Bill released to House Calendar |
2021-04-15 | House | Reported out of State Affairs Committee |
2021-04-15 | House | Favorable by State Affairs Committee |
2021-04-13 | House | Added to State Affairs Committee agenda |
2021-04-02 | House | Now in State Affairs Committee |
2021-04-02 | House | Referred to State Affairs Committee |
2021-04-01 | House | 1st Reading (Committee Substitute 1) |
2021-04-01 | House | CS Filed |
2021-04-01 | House | Laid on Table under Rule 7.18(a) |
2021-04-01 | House | Reported out of Local Administration & Veterans Affairs Subcommittee |
2021-04-01 | House | Favorable with CS by Local Administration & Veterans Affairs Subcommittee |
2021-03-30 | House | Added to Local Administration & Veterans Affairs Subcommittee agenda |
2021-03-02 | House | 1st Reading (Original Filed Version) |
2021-02-22 | House | Now in Local Administration & Veterans Affairs Subcommittee |
2021-02-22 | House | Referred to State Affairs Committee |
2021-02-22 | House | Referred to Local Administration & Veterans Affairs Subcommittee |
2021-02-10 | House | Filed |