FL H0909 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 5-2)
Status: Introduced on February 16 2023 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-04-25 - Laid on Table; companion bill(s) passed, see SB 948 (Ch. 2023-53)
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 16 2023 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-04-25 - Laid on Table; companion bill(s) passed, see SB 948 (Ch. 2023-53)
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizes DOS to implement password protected system for electronic filing of certain records; provides person using system may be required to verify his or her credentials; authorizes DOS to allow entities to identify authorized account holders; requires DOS to use e-mail addresses as initial authorized account holder & send codes to such e-mail addresses; authorizes DOS to require verification of identities through use of certain methods.
Title
Electronic Filing of Records with the Department of State
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-03-31 - House - House State Affairs Committee (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2023-03-21 - House - House Infrastructure & Tourism Appropriations Subcommittee (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2023-03-09 - House - House Constitutional Rights, Rule of Law & Government Operations Subcommittee (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-03-21 - House - House Infrastructure & Tourism Appropriations Subcommittee (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2023-03-09 - House - House Constitutional Rights, Rule of Law & Government Operations Subcommittee (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-04-25 | House | Laid on Table; companion bill(s) passed, see SB 948 (Ch. 2023-53) |
2023-04-25 | House | Substituted SB 948 |
2023-04-20 | House | Bill added to Special Order Calendar (4/25/2023) |
2023-04-20 | House | Added to Second Reading Calendar |
2023-04-20 | House | Temporarily postponed, on 2nd Reading |
2023-04-13 | House | Bill added to Special Order Calendar (4/20/2023) |
2023-04-03 | House | Added to Second Reading Calendar |
2023-04-03 | House | 1st Reading (Committee Substitute 2) |
2023-04-03 | House | Bill referred to House Calendar |
2023-03-31 | House | CS Filed |
2023-03-31 | House | Laid on Table under Rule 7.18(a) |
2023-03-31 | House | Reported out of State Affairs Committee |
2023-03-31 | House | Favorable with CS by State Affairs Committee |
2023-03-29 | House | Added to State Affairs Committee agenda |
2023-03-21 | House | Now in State Affairs Committee |
2023-03-21 | House | Reported out of Infrastructure & Tourism Appropriations Subcommittee |
2023-03-21 | House | Favorable by Infrastructure & Tourism Appropriations Subcommittee |
2023-03-17 | House | Added to Infrastructure & Tourism Appropriations Subcommittee agenda |
2023-03-13 | House | 1st Reading (Committee Substitute 1) |
2023-03-13 | House | Now in Infrastructure & Tourism Appropriations Subcommittee |
2023-03-13 | House | Referred to State Affairs Committee |
2023-03-13 | House | Referred to Infrastructure & Tourism Appropriations Subcommittee |
2023-03-10 | House | CS Filed |
2023-03-10 | House | Laid on Table under Rule 7.18(a) |
2023-03-10 | House | Reported out of Constitutional Rights, Rule of Law & Government Operations Subcommittee |
2023-03-09 | House | Favorable with CS by Constitutional Rights, Rule of Law & Government Operations Subcommittee |
2023-03-07 | House | 1st Reading (Original Filed Version) |
2023-03-07 | House | Added to Constitutional Rights, Rule of Law & Government Operations Subcommittee agenda |
2023-02-28 | House | Now in Constitutional Rights, Rule of Law & Government Operations Subcommittee |
2023-02-28 | House | Referred to State Affairs Committee |
2023-02-28 | House | Referred to Infrastructure & Tourism Appropriations Subcommittee |
2023-02-28 | House | Referred to Constitutional Rights, Rule of Law & Government Operations Subcommittee |
2023-02-16 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H911 (Related) 2023-04-25 - Laid on Table; companion bill(s) passed, see CS/SB 946 (Ch. 2023-52), SB 948 (Ch. 2023-53)
S948 (Similar To) 2023-05-12 - Chapter No. 2023-53
S948 (Similar To) 2023-05-12 - Chapter No. 2023-53