FL H0905 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 23 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-23 - Chapter No. 2021-149
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 23 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-23 - Chapter No. 2021-149
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizing the Agency for Health Care Administration, in consultation with the Department of Elderly Affairs, to approve entities applying to deliver PACE services in the state; requiring applications to be reviewed and considered on a continuous basis; requiring notice of applications to be published in the Florida Administrative Register; providing specified application requirements for such prospective PACE organizations; requiring the agency to oversee and monitor the PACE program and organizations; providing that a PACE organization is exempt from certain requirements, etc.
Title
Program of All-Inclusive Care for the Elderly
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-04-29 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#420 (Y: 116 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-26 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RCS#49 (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-01 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#50 (Y: 115 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-18 - House - House Health & Human Services Committee (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-03-08 - House - House Finance & Facilities Subcommittee (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-04-26 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RCS#49 (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-01 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#50 (Y: 115 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-18 - House - House Health & Human Services Committee (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-03-08 - House - House Finance & Facilities Subcommittee (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-06-23 | Chapter No. 2021-149 | |
2021-06-21 | Approved by Governor | |
2021-06-16 | Signed by Officers and presented to Governor | |
2021-04-29 | House | Message sent to senate |
2021-04-29 | House | Ordered engrossed, then enrolled |
2021-04-29 | House | CS passed as amended; YEAS 116, NAYS 0 |
2021-04-29 | House | Amendment 501124 Concur |
2021-04-29 | House | Added to Senate Message List |
2021-04-26 | House | In Messages |
2021-04-26 | Senate | CS passed as amended; YEAS 40 NAYS 0 |
2021-04-26 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2021-04-26 | Senate | Amendment(s) adopted (501124) |
2021-04-26 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2021-04-26 | Senate | Substituted for CS/CS/SB 1242 |
2021-04-26 | Senate | Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading |
2021-04-26 | Senate | Withdrawn from Appropriations |
2021-04-08 | Senate | Received |
2021-04-08 | Senate | Referred to Appropriations |
2021-04-07 | House | Message sent to senate |
2021-04-07 | Senate | In Messages |
2021-04-01 | House | CS passed; YEAS 115, NAYS 0 |
2021-04-01 | House | Read 3rd time |
2021-03-31 | House | Added to Third Reading Calendar |
2021-03-31 | House | Placed on 3rd reading |
2021-03-31 | House | Read 2nd time |
2021-03-25 | House | Bill added to Special Order Calendar (3/31/2021) |
2021-03-22 | House | Added to Second Reading Calendar |
2021-03-22 | House | Bill referred to House Calendar |
2021-03-22 | House | 1st Reading (Committee Substitute 1) |
2021-03-19 | House | CS Filed |
2021-03-19 | House | Laid on Table under Rule 7.18(a) |
2021-03-19 | House | Reported out of Health & Human Services Committee |
2021-03-18 | House | Favorable with CS by Health & Human Services Committee |
2021-03-16 | House | Added to Health & Human Services Committee agenda |
2021-03-08 | House | Now in Health & Human Services Committee |
2021-03-08 | House | Reported out of Finance & Facilities Subcommittee |
2021-03-08 | House | Favorable by Finance & Facilities Subcommittee |
2021-03-04 | House | Added to Finance & Facilities Subcommittee agenda |
2021-03-02 | House | 1st Reading (Original Filed Version) |
2021-02-22 | House | Now in Finance & Facilities Subcommittee |
2021-02-22 | House | Referred to Health & Human Services Committee |
2021-02-22 | House | Referred to Finance & Facilities Subcommittee |
2021-02-10 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S1242 (Similar To) 2021-04-26 - Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/HB 905 (Ch. 2021-149)