FL H0895 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on February 10 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-04-30 - Died on Second Reading Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 10 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-04-30 - Died on Second Reading Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizes applicant for license to make & collect loans under Florida Consumer Finance Act to provide bond, certificate of deposit, or letter of credit in lieu of liquid assets; provides requirements for such bonds, certificates of deposit, & letters of credit; revises references to implementing regulations of federal Truth in Lending Act; prohibits person licensed to make & collect consumer finance loans from charging prepayment penalties for loans; amends grounds for denial of license or disciplinary action; provides requirements for loan terms; revises exceptions for licensee during Financial Technology Sandbox period.
Title
Consumer Finance Loans
Sponsors
House Commerce Committee | House Insurance and Banking Subcommittee | Rep. Cyndi Stevenson [R] | Rep. David Smith [R] |
Roll Calls
2021-03-29 - House - House Commerce Committee (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-03-10 - House - House Insurance & Banking Subcommittee (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-10 - House - House Insurance & Banking Subcommittee (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-30 | House | Died on Second Reading Calendar |
2021-04-01 | House | Added to Second Reading Calendar |
2021-04-01 | House | Bill referred to House Calendar |
2021-03-30 | House | 1st Reading (Committee Substitute 2) |
2021-03-30 | House | CS Filed |
2021-03-30 | House | Laid on Table under Rule 7.18(a) |
2021-03-30 | House | Reported out of Commerce Committee |
2021-03-29 | House | Favorable with CS by Commerce Committee |
2021-03-25 | House | Added to Commerce Committee agenda |
2021-03-15 | House | Now in Commerce Committee |
2021-03-15 | House | Referred to Commerce Committee |
2021-03-11 | House | 1st Reading (Committee Substitute 1) |
2021-03-11 | House | CS Filed |
2021-03-11 | House | Laid on Table under Rule 7.18(a) |
2021-03-11 | House | Reported out of Insurance & Banking Subcommittee |
2021-03-10 | House | Favorable with CS by Insurance & Banking Subcommittee |
2021-03-08 | House | Added to Insurance & Banking Subcommittee agenda |
2021-03-02 | House | 1st Reading (Original Filed Version) |
2021-02-22 | House | Now in Insurance & Banking Subcommittee |
2021-02-22 | House | Referred to Commerce Committee |
2021-02-22 | House | Referred to Insurance & Banking Subcommittee |
2021-02-10 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S1478 (Same As) 2021-04-30 - Died in Commerce and Tourism
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
516 | 03 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
516 | 031 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
516 | 05 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
516 | 07 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
516 | 36 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
559 | 952 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |