FL H0883 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on May 5 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-05-05 - Died in Criminal Justice Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on May 5 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-05-05 - Died in Criminal Justice Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Revises definition of term "machine gun."
Title
Machine Guns
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-05-05 | House | Died in Criminal Justice Subcommittee |
2023-03-07 | House | 1st Reading (Original Filed Version) |
2023-02-28 | House | Now in Criminal Justice Subcommittee |
2023-02-28 | House | Referred to Judiciary Committee |
2023-02-28 | House | Referred to Justice Appropriations Subcommittee |
2023-02-28 | House | Referred to Criminal Justice Subcommittee |
2023-02-16 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S368 (Similar To) 2023-05-05 - Died in Criminal Justice
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
790 | 001 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
921 | 0024 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2023/883 |
Text | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2023/883/BillText/Filed/PDF |