FL H0881 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 14 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-14 - Died in Local, Federal and Veterans Affairs Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 14 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-14 - Died in Local, Federal and Veterans Affairs Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Provides for special election to be held on August 18, 2020, pursuant to State Constitution, for approval or rejection of amendments to State Constitution proposed by joint resolution, relating to ad valorem tax discount for spouses of certain deceased veterans who had permanent, combat-related disabilities.
Title
Special Election
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-14 | House | Died in Local, Federal and Veterans Affairs Subcommittee |
2020-03-14 | House | Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration |
2020-01-14 | House | Introduced |
2019-12-12 | House | Referred to Local, Federal and Veterans Affairs Subcommittee; Ways and Means Committee; State Affairs Committee |
2019-12-09 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H877 (Related) 2020-06-17 - Signed by Officers and filed with Secretary of State
S1078 (Same As) 2020-03-14 - Died in Ethics and Elections
H879 (Similar To) 2020-09-21 - Chapter No. 2020-179, companion bill(s) passed, see HJR 877 (Passed)
S1076 (Similar To) 2020-03-04 - Laid on Table, refer to HJR 877
S1078 (Same As) 2020-03-14 - Died in Ethics and Elections
H879 (Similar To) 2020-09-21 - Chapter No. 2020-179, companion bill(s) passed, see HJR 877 (Passed)
S1076 (Similar To) 2020-03-04 - Laid on Table, refer to HJR 877
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2020/881 |
Text | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2020/881/BillText/Filed/PDF |