FL H0879 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum:
Status: Passed on June 26 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-26 - Chapter No. 2017-145
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum:
Status: Passed on June 26 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-26 - Chapter No. 2017-145
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Revises elements that constitute theft of utilities; specifies circumstances that constitute prima facie evidence of violations; specifies types of damages that may be recovered for damaging property of utility or for theft of electricity services; specifies methods & bases used to determine & assess damages for damaging property of utility or for theft of electricity services.
Title
Unlawful Acquisition of Utility Services
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-05-01 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RCS#19 (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-04-28 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#325 (Y: 119 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-28 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#325 (Y: 119 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-06-26 | Chapter No. 2017-145 | |
2017-06-23 | Approved by Governor | |
2017-06-14 | Signed by Officers and presented to Governor | |
2017-05-01 | House | Ordered enrolled |
2017-05-01 | Senate | CS passed; YEAS 38 NAYS 0 |
2017-05-01 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2017-04-28 | Senate | Placed on 3rd reading |
2017-04-28 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2017-04-28 | Senate | Substituted for CS/CS/SB 776 |
2017-04-28 | Senate | Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading |
2017-04-28 | Senate | Withdrawn from Rules |
2017-04-28 | Senate | Received |
2017-04-28 | Senate | Referred to Rules |
2017-04-28 | Senate | In Messages |
2017-04-28 | House | CS passed; YEAS 119 NAYS 0 |
2017-04-28 | House | Read 3rd time |
2017-04-27 | House | Placed on 3rd reading |
2017-04-27 | House | Read 2nd time |
2017-04-24 | House | Placed on Special Order Calendar, 04/27/17 |
2017-04-24 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2017-04-24 | House | Favorable by- Commerce Committee; YEAS 26 NAYS 0 |
2017-04-22 | House | On Committee agenda-- Commerce Committee, 04/24/17, 9:00 am, Webster Hall |
2017-04-20 | House | Now in Commerce Committee |
2017-04-18 | House | CS by Justice Appropriations Subcommittee read 1st time |
2017-04-18 | House | Pending review of CS under Rule 7.18(c) |
2017-04-17 | House | CS by Justice Appropriations Subcommittee; YEAS 11 NAYS 0 |
2017-04-13 | House | On Committee agenda-- Justice Appropriations Subcommittee, 04/17/17, 4:00 pm, Morris Hall |
2017-03-15 | House | Now in Justice Appropriations Subcommittee |
2017-03-15 | House | Favorable by Energy and Utilities Subcommittee; YEAS 14 NAYS 0 |
2017-03-13 | House | On Committee agenda-- Energy and Utilities Subcommittee, 03/15/17, 9:00 am, Webster Hall |
2017-03-07 | House | Introduced |
2017-03-01 | House | Referred to Energy and Utilities Subcommittee; Justice Appropriations Subcommittee; Commerce Committee |
2017-02-17 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S0776 (Same As) 2017-04-28 - Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/HB 879 (Ch. 2017-145)
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
812 | 014 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
812 | 14 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |