FL H0871 | 2014 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on May 2 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-05-02 - Died in Civil Justice Subcommittee, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/CS/HB 807 (Ch. 2014-133)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Revises & provides liability of certain condominium & homeowners' association unit owners acquiring title; defines "previous owner."

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Residential Properties

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2014-05-02HouseDied in Civil Justice Subcommittee, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/CS/HB 807 (Ch. 2014-133)
2014-03-04HouseIntroduced
2014-02-20HouseReferred to Civil Justice Subcommittee; Business and Professional Regulation Subcommittee; Judiciary Committee
2014-02-10HouseFiled

Same As/Similar To

S0798 (Similar To) 2014-04-28 - Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/CS/HB 807 (Ch. 2014-133)
S1462 (Similar To) 2014-05-02 - Died in Judiciary, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/CS/HB 807 (Ch. 2014-133)
S1458 (Similar To) 2014-05-02 - Died in Regulated Industries
H1405 (Similar To) 2014-05-02 - Died in Civil Justice Subcommittee
H0807 (Similar To) 2014-06-13 - Chapter No. 2014-133

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
718116Amended CodeSee Bill Text
7203085Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback