FL H0807 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (? 3-1)
Status: Passed on June 13 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-06-13 - Chapter No. 2014-133
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (? 3-1)
Status: Passed on June 13 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-06-13 - Chapter No. 2014-133
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Providing that timeshare projects are not subject to annual inspection requirements; providing that a condominium association that does not own any units classified as timeshare projects is not required to apply for or receive a public lodging establishment license; providing that timeshare projects within separate buildings or at separate locations but managed by one licensed agent may be combined in a single license application; authorizing an association to inspect and repair abandoned condominium units; defining the term "previous owner" for purposes of provisions relating to the liability of condominium unit owners for assessments, etc.
Title
Residential Properties
Sponsors
House Judiciary Committee | House Business and Professional Regulation Subcommittee | House Civil Justice Subcommittee | Rep. George Moraitis [R] |
Roll Calls
2014-04-29 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RCS#14 (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-25 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#726 (Y: 118 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-25 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#726 (Y: 118 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-06-13 | Chapter No. 2014-133 | |
2014-06-13 | Approved by Governor | |
2014-06-05 | Signed by Officers and presented to Governor | |
2014-04-29 | House | Ordered enrolled |
2014-04-29 | Senate | CS passed; YEAS 38 NAYS 0 |
2014-04-29 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2014-04-28 | Senate | Placed on 3rd reading |
2014-04-28 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2014-04-28 | Senate | Substituted for CS/CS/CS/SB 798 |
2014-04-28 | Senate | Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading |
2014-04-28 | Senate | Withdrawn from Regulated Industries; Judiciary; Appropriations |
2014-04-25 | Senate | Received |
2014-04-25 | Senate | Referred to Regulated Industries; Judiciary; Appropriations |
2014-04-25 | Senate | In Messages |
2014-04-25 | House | CS passed as amended; YEAS 118 NAYS 0 |
2014-04-25 | House | Read 3rd time |
2014-04-24 | House | Placed on 3rd reading |
2014-04-24 | House | Amendment(s) adopted (102057, 367497, 615951, 828553) |
2014-04-24 | House | Read 2nd time |
2014-04-22 | House | Placed on Special Order Calendar, 04/24/14 |
2014-04-01 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2014-03-28 | House | CS/CS/CS by Judiciary Committee read 1st time |
2014-03-28 | House | Pending review of CS -under Rule 7.19(c) |
2014-03-27 | House | CS/CS/CS by- Judiciary Committee; YEAS 17 NAYS 0 |
2014-03-25 | House | On Committee agenda-- Judiciary Committee, 03/27/14, 8:30 am, Sumner Hall |
2014-03-24 | House | Now in Judiciary Committee |
2014-03-19 | House | CS/CS by Business and Professional Regulation Subcommittee read 1st time |
2014-03-19 | House | Pending review of CS under Rule 7.19(c) |
2014-03-18 | House | CS/CS by Business and Professional Regulation Subcommittee; YEAS 9 NAYS 3 |
2014-03-14 | House | On Committee agenda-- Business and Professional Regulation Subcommittee, 03/18/14, 12:30 pm, 12 HOB |
2014-03-13 | House | Now in Business and Professional Regulation Subcommittee |
2014-03-10 | House | CS by Civil Justice Subcommittee read 1st time |
2014-03-10 | House | Pending review of CS under Rule 7.19(c) |
2014-03-05 | House | CS by Civil Justice Subcommittee; YEAS 12 NAYS 0 |
2014-03-04 | House | Introduced |
2014-03-03 | House | PCS on Committee agenda-- Civil Justice Subcommittee, 03/05/14, 12:00 pm, Sumner Hall |
2014-02-14 | House | Referred to Civil Justice Subcommittee; Business and Professional Regulation Subcommittee; Judiciary Committee |
2014-02-04 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S0798 (Similar To) 2014-04-28 - Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/CS/HB 807 (Ch. 2014-133)
H0871 (Similar To) 2014-05-02 - Died in Civil Justice Subcommittee, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/CS/HB 807 (Ch. 2014-133)
S1462 (Similar To) 2014-05-02 - Died in Judiciary, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/CS/HB 807 (Ch. 2014-133)
S1450 (Similar To) 2014-05-02 - Died in Messages, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/CS/HB 807 (Ch. 2014-133)
H0871 (Similar To) 2014-05-02 - Died in Civil Justice Subcommittee, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/CS/HB 807 (Ch. 2014-133)
S1462 (Similar To) 2014-05-02 - Died in Judiciary, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/CS/HB 807 (Ch. 2014-133)
S1450 (Similar To) 2014-05-02 - Died in Messages, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/CS/HB 807 (Ch. 2014-133)
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
509 | 013 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
509 | 032 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
509 | 221 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
509 | 241 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
509 | 242 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
509 | 251 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
712 | 05 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
718 | 110 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
718 | 111 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
718 | 112 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
718 | 116 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
718 | 117 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
718 | 50151 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
718 | 707 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
719 | 104 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
719 | 106 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
719 | 128 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
720 | 303 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
720 | 306 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
720 | 316 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |