FL H0871 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 9-0)
Status: Failed on April 30 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-30 - Died in Messages
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 9-0)
Status: Failed on April 30 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-30 - Died in Messages
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Repeals Family Builders Program. EFFECTIVE DATE: 07/01/2010.
Title
Family Builders Program
Sponsors
Rep. Janet Adkins [R] | Rep. Mike Horner [R] | Rep. Carlos Lopez-Cantera [R] | Rep. Seth McKeel [R] |
Rep. Peter Nehr [R] | Rep. Marlene O'Toole [R] | Rep. Lake Ray [R] | Rep. Ronald Renuart [R] |
Rep. Juan Zapata [R] |
Roll Calls
2010-03-10 - House - House Roll Call No. 0536 - Passage (Y: 109 N: 0 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-04-30 | Died in Messages | |
2010-03-16 | In Messages | |
2010-03-10 | Read 3rd time -HJ 00239; CS passed; YEAS 109 NAYS 0 -HJ 00240 | |
2010-03-09 | Placed on Special Order Calendar; Read 2nd time -HJ 00229 | |
2010-03-03 | CS read 1st time on 03/03/10 -HJ 00204; Pending review of CS -under Rule 7.20; Placed on Calendar -HJ 00204 | |
2010-03-02 | Introduced, referred to Health & Family Services Policy Council -HJ 00079; On Council agenda-- Health & Family Services Policy Council, 03/01/10, 2:15 pm, Webster Hall; CS by- Health & Family Services Policy Council; YEAS 14 NAYS 0 -HJ 00172 | |
2010-03-01 | CS by- Health & Family Services Policy Council; YEAS 14 NAYS 0 | |
2010-02-22 | On Council agenda-- Health & Family Services Policy Council, 03/01/10, 2:15 pm, Webster Hall | |
2010-02-18 | Referred to Health & Family Services Policy Council | |
2010-02-02 | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S2258 (Similar To) 2010-04-30 - Died in Committee on Children, Families, and Elder Affairs
H7081 (Similar To) 2010-04-30 - Died, reference deferred, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/SB 1412 (Ch. 2010-102)
S0724 (Similar To) 2010-04-30 - Died in Messages, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/SB 1412 (Ch. 2010-102)
H7081 (Similar To) 2010-04-30 - Died, reference deferred, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/SB 1412 (Ch. 2010-102)
S0724 (Similar To) 2010-04-30 - Died in Messages, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/SB 1412 (Ch. 2010-102)
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
0039 | 0121 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
0039 | 301 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
0039 | 311 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
0039 | 312 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
0039 | 313 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
0039 | 314 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
0039 | 315 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
0039 | 316 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
0039 | 317 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
0039 | 318 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |