FL H0863 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 4-1)
Status: Failed on April 28 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-04-28 - Died in Insurance and Banking Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 4-1)
Status: Failed on April 28 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-04-28 - Died in Insurance and Banking Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Designates act as "Florida Patient Protection Act"; revises prescription drug coverage requirements for managed care plans; provides for appeal of certain health care coverage decisions made by managed care plans, health insurers, & HMOs; authorizes OIR to hold certain public hearings; requires OIR to issue certain reports annually; prohibits discriminatory benefit plans; provides penalties for use of discriminatory treatment criteria; provides requirements for certain civil actions brought against insurer or HMO; provides penalties & attorney fees.
Title
Health Insurance
Sponsors
Rep. Shawn Harrison [R] | Rep. Matt Gaetz [R] | Sen. Debbie Mayfield [R] | Sen. Darryl Rouson [D] |
Sen. Greg Steube [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-04-28 | House | Died in Insurance and Banking Subcommittee |
2015-03-03 | House | Introduced |
2015-02-26 | House | Referred to Insurance and Banking Subcommittee; Health Innovation Subcommittee; Appropriations Committee; Regulatory Affairs Committee |
2015-02-18 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S0784 (Similar To) 2015-05-01 - Died in Appropriations
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
409 | 967 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
627 | 6165 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
627 | 6466 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
627 | 64996 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
641 | 229 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
641 | 3917 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
641 | 394 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2015/863 |
Text | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2015/0863/BillText/Filed/PDF |