FL H0857 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on February 15 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-03-05 - Introduced
Pending: House Oversight, Transparency and Public Management Subcommittee Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Grants certain benefits to firefighter upon receiving diagnosis of cancer if certain conditions are met; requires employer to make certain disability payments to firefighter in event of total & permanent disability; provides for death benefits to firefighter's beneficiary if firefighter dies as result of cancer or cancer treatments; specifies that any costs associated with benefits granted by act must be borne by employer; requires Division of State Fire Marshal to adopt certain rules.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Firefighters

Sponsors

Rep. Matt Willhite [D]Rep. Chris Latvala [R]Rep. Ramon Alexander [D]Rep. Vance Aloupis [R]
Rep. Alex Andrade [R]Rep. Bruce Antone [D]Rep. Loranne Ausley [D]Rep. Bryan Avila [R]
Rep. Melony Bell [R]Rep. Mike Beltran [R]Rep. Chuck Brannan [R]Rep. Kamia Brown [D]
Rep. James Buchanan [R]Rep. James Bush [D]Rep. Cord Byrd [R]Rep. Mike Caruso [R]
Rep. Joseph Casello [D]Rep. Chuck Clemons [R]Rep. John Cortes [D]Rep. Kimberly Daniels [D]
Rep. Tracie Davis [D]Rep. Ben Diamond [D]Rep. Nick DiCeglie [R]Rep. Byron Donalds [R]
Rep. Brad Drake [R]Rep. Fentrice Driskell [D]Rep. Bobby Dubose [D]Rep. Wyman Duggan [R]
Rep. Nicholas Duran [D]Rep. Anna Eskamani [D]Rep. Javier Fernandez [D]Rep. Juan Fernandez-Barquin [R]
Rep. Jason Fischer [R]Rep. Heather Fitzenhagen [R]Rep. Joseph Geller [D]Rep. Joy Goff-Marcil [D]
Rep. Margaret Good [D]Rep. Michael Gottlieb [D]Rep. Tommy Gregory [R]Rep. Michael Grieco [D]
Rep. Dianne Hart [D]Rep. Adam Hattersley [D]Rep. Walter Hill [R]Rep. Delores Hogan Johnson [D]
Rep. Kristin Jacobs [D]Rep. Al Jacquet [D]Rep. Evan Jenne [D]Rep. Shevrin Jones [D]
Rep. Dotie Joseph [D]Rep. Mike LaRosa [R]Rep. Chip LaMarca [R]Rep. Tom Leek [R]
Rep. Kionne McGhee [D]Rep. Amy Mercado [D]Rep. Wengay Newton [D]Rep. Anika Omphroy [D]
Rep. Toby Overdorf [R]Rep. Bobby Payne [R]Rep. Rene Plasencia [R]Rep. Cindy Polo [D]
Rep. Tina Polsky [D]Rep. Mel Ponder [R]Rep. Holly Raschein [R]Rep. Will Robinson [R]
Rep. Anthony Rodriguez [R]Rep. Ana Rodriguez [R]Rep. Rick Roth [R]Rep. David Santiago [R]
Rep. David Silvers [D]Rep. Tyler Sirois [R]Rep. Irving Slosberg [D]Rep. Carlos Smith [D]
Rep. David Smith [R]Rep. Richard Stark [D]Rep. Geraldine Thompson [D]Rep. Jackie Toledo [R]
Rep. Josie Tomkow [R]Rep. Susan Valdes [D]Rep. Clovis Watson [D]Rep. Jennifer Webb [D]
Rep. Patricia Hawkins-Williams [D]Rep. Clay Yarborough [R]Rep. Ardian Zika [R]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-05HouseIntroduced
2019-02-28HouseReferred to Oversight, Transparency and Public Management Subcommittee; Appropriations Committee; State Affairs Committee
2019-02-15HouseFiled

Same As/Similar To

S426 (Same As) 2019-04-18 - Placed on Special Order Calendar, 04/23/19
H7129 (Similar To) 2019-04-18 - Introduced

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
1121816Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback