FL H0851 | 2015 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 18 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-06-18 - Chapter No. 2015-187
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Provides that unpaid rentals, rates, or charges for services & facilities of utility system constitute lien on any parcel or property affected by such services or facilities.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Manatee County

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2015-04-29 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RCS#11 (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-24 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#324 (Y: 116 N: 1 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2015-06-18 Chapter No. 2015-187
2015-06-10 Approved by Governor
2015-05-26 Signed by Officers and presented to Governor
2015-04-29HouseOrdered enrolled
2015-04-29SenatePassed; YEAS 40 NAYS 0
2015-04-29SenateRead 3rd time
2015-04-29SenateRead 2nd time
2015-04-29SenateWithdrawn from Rules
2015-04-27SenatePlaced on Local Calendar, 04/29/15
2015-04-24SenateReceived
2015-04-24SenateReferred to Rules
2015-04-24SenateIn Messages
2015-04-24HousePassed; YEAS 114 NAYS 3
2015-04-24HouseRead 3rd time
2015-04-24HouseRead 2nd time
2015-04-22HousePlaced on Special Order Calendar, 04/24/15
2015-04-01HousePlaced on Calendar
2015-04-01HouseFavorable by- Regulatory Affairs Committee; YEAS 13 NAYS 0
2015-03-30HouseOn Committee agenda-- Regulatory Affairs Committee, 04/01/15, 8:00 am, Sumner Hall
2015-03-25HouseNow in Regulatory Affairs Committee
2015-03-25HouseFavorable by Local Government Affairs Subcommittee; YEAS 12 NAYS 0
2015-03-23HouseOn Committee agenda-- Local Government Affairs Subcommittee, 03/25/15, 8:00 am, Webster Hall
2015-03-16HouseOn Committee agenda-- Local Government Affairs Subcommittee, 03/18/15, 8:00 am, Webster Hall --Not considered
2015-03-03HouseIntroduced
2015-02-26HouseReferred to Local Government Affairs Subcommittee; Regulatory Affairs Committee
2015-02-18HouseFiled

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback