FL H0851 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 10-0)
Status: Passed on June 7 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-06-07 - Chapter No. 2010-221; companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/SB 1412 (Ch. 2010-102)
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 10-0)
Status: Passed on June 7 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-06-07 - Chapter No. 2010-221; companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/SB 1412 (Ch. 2010-102)
Summary
Repeals provisions creating & providing duties of Florida Legal Resource Center.
Title
Florida Legal Resource Center [SPSC]
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-06-07 | Chapter No. 2010-221; companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/SB 1412 (Ch. 2010-102) | |
2010-06-04 | Approved by Governor | |
2010-05-21 | Signed by Officers and presented to Governor | |
2010-04-29 | Ordered enrolled -HJ 01285 | |
2010-04-29 | Read 3rd time -SJ 01086; Passed; YEAS 35 NAYS 0 -SJ 01086 | |
2010-04-28 | Withdrawn from Judiciary; Community Affairs; Governmental Oversight and Accountability -SJ 00983; Substituted for SB 2236 -SJ 00983; Read 2nd time -SJ 00983 | |
2010-04-26 | Received -SJ 00868; Referred to Judiciary; Community Affairs; Governmental Oversight and Accountability -SJ 00868 | |
2010-03-16 | In Messages | |
2010-03-10 | Read 3rd time -HJ 00239; Passed; YEAS 113 NAYS 0 -HJ 00239 | |
2010-03-09 | Placed on Special Order Calendar; Read 2nd time -HJ 00229 | |
2010-03-02 | Introduced, referred to Criminal & Civil Justice Policy Council -HJ 00077; On Council agenda-- Criminal & Civil Justice Policy Council, 03/01/10, 4:30 pm, 404-H; Favorable by- Criminal & Civil Justice Policy Council; YEAS 14 NAYS 0 -HJ 00171; Placed on Calendar -HJ 00171 | |
2010-03-01 | Favorable by- Criminal & Civil Justice Policy Council; YEAS 14 NAYS 0; Placed on Calendar | |
2010-02-22 | On Council agenda-- Criminal & Civil Justice Policy Council, 03/01/10, 4:30 pm, 404-H | |
2010-02-10 | Referred to Criminal & Civil Justice Policy Council | |
2010-02-01 | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S1412 (Similar To) 2010-05-27 - Chapter No. 2010-102; companion bill(s) passed, see HB 851 (Ch. 2010-221), CS/CS/CS/HB 1271 (Ch. 2010-225), HB 7037 (Ch. 2010-70), HB 7131 (Ch. 2010-117), CS/HB 7157 (Ch. 2010-138), HB 7243 (Ch. 2010-143), CS/SB 2386 (Ch. 2010-151)
S2236 (Similar To) 2010-04-28 - Placed on Special Order Calendar; Read 2nd time -SJ 00983; Substituted HB 851 -SJ 00983; Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see HB 851 (Ch. 2010-221), CS/CS/SB 1412 (Ch. 2010-102) -SJ 00983
S2236 (Similar To) 2010-04-28 - Placed on Special Order Calendar; Read 2nd time -SJ 00983; Substituted HB 851 -SJ 00983; Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see HB 851 (Ch. 2010-221), CS/CS/SB 1412 (Ch. 2010-102) -SJ 00983
Code Citations
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/index.cfm?Mode=Bills&SubMenu=1&Tab=session&BI_Mode=ViewBillInfo&BillNum=0851&Chamber=House&Year=2010 |