FL H0847 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Failed on March 8 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-03-08 - Died in PreK-12 Appropriations Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Failed on March 8 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-03-08 - Died in PreK-12 Appropriations Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Revises criteria for child to receive priority for participation in school readiness program; provides eligibility requirements for school readiness program provider to receive specified funding.
Title
School Readiness Program
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-01-25 - House - House Education Quality Subcommittee (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-08 | House | Died in PreK-12 Appropriations Subcommittee |
2024-01-25 | House | Now in PreK-12 Appropriations Subcommittee |
2024-01-25 | House | Reported out of Education Quality Subcommittee |
2024-01-25 | House | Favorable by Education Quality Subcommittee |
2024-01-23 | House | Added to Education Quality Subcommittee agenda |
2024-01-09 | House | 1st Reading (Original Filed Version) |
2023-12-27 | House | Now in Education Quality Subcommittee |
2023-12-27 | House | Referred to Education & Employment Committee |
2023-12-27 | House | Referred to PreK-12 Appropriations Subcommittee |
2023-12-27 | House | Referred to Education Quality Subcommittee |
2023-12-12 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S1400 (Same As) 2024-03-08 - Died in Education Pre-K -12
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
1002 | 87 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
1002 | 89 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |