FL H0831 | 2015 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on April 28 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-04-28 - Died in Highway and Waterway Safety Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Provides fee for registration of modified agriculture vehicles; provides definition; exempts drivers of modified agriculture vehicles from requirement to possess valid commercial driver license.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Registration of Agriculture Transport Vehicles

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2015-04-28HouseDied in Highway and Waterway Safety Subcommittee
2015-03-03HouseIntroduced
2015-02-26HouseReferred to Highway and Waterway Safety Subcommittee; Transportation and Economic Development Appropriations Subcommittee; Economic Affairs Committee
2015-02-18HouseFiled

Same As/Similar To

S1072 (Similar To) 2015-05-01 - Died in Appropriations

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
32008Amended CodeSee Bill Text
32253Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback