FL H0829 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Vetoed on April 27 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-27 - Placed on Special Order Calendar; Substituted CS/CS/SB 1004 (Vetoed by Governor); Laid on Table -HJ 01165
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Vetoed on April 27 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-27 - Placed on Special Order Calendar; Substituted CS/CS/SB 1004 (Vetoed by Governor); Laid on Table -HJ 01165
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Deletes provisions prohibiting electioneering communication expenditures by local governments; revises applicability of provisions restricting expenditures by local governments; authorizes board of county commissioners to negotiate leases of certain real property for limited period; authorizes transfers of right-of-way between local governments by deed.
Title
Local Government
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-04-27 | Placed on Special Order Calendar; Substituted CS/CS/SB 1004 (Vetoed by Governor); Laid on Table -HJ 01165 | |
2010-04-20 | CS read 1st time on 04/20/10 -HJ 00788; Pending review of CS -under Rule 7.20; Placed on Calendar -HJ 00789 | |
2010-04-16 | CS/CS/CS by- Economic Development & Community Affairs Policy Council; YEAS 15 NAYS 0 -HJ 00791 | |
2010-04-15 | On Council agenda-- Economic Development & Community Affairs Policy Council, 04/16/10, 9:00 am, 404-H | |
2010-03-24 | Now in Economic Development & Community Affairs Policy Council -HJ 00395 | |
2010-03-23 | CS read 1st time on 03/23/10 -HJ 00373; Pending review of CS under Rule 7.20 | |
2010-03-22 | CS/CS by Criminal & Civil Justice Policy Council; YEAS 13 NAYS 1 -HJ 00380 | |
2010-03-18 | On Council agenda-- Criminal & Civil Justice Policy Council, 03/22/10, 1:00 pm, 404-H | |
2010-03-08 | Original reference(s) removed: Criminal & Civil Justice Appropriations (CGHC); CS referred to Criminal & Civil Justice Policy Council; Economic Development & Community Affairs Policy Council -HJ 00225; Now in Criminal & Civil Justice Policy Council | |
2010-03-05 | CS read 1st time on 03/05/10 -HJ 00221; Pending review of CS under Rule 7.20 | |
2010-03-03 | CS by Military & Local Affairs Policy (EDCA); YEAS 12 NAYS 0 -HJ 00222 | |
2010-03-02 | Introduced, referred to Military & Local Affairs Policy (EDCA); Criminal & Civil Justice Policy Council; Criminal & Civil Justice Appropriations (CGHC); Economic Development & Community Affairs Policy Council -HJ 00076; PCS on Committee agenda-- Military & Local Affairs Policy (EDCA), 03/03/10, 9:00 am, Webster Hall | |
2010-03-01 | PCS on Committee agenda-- Military & Local Affairs Policy (EDCA), 03/03/10, 9:00 am, Webster Hall | |
2010-02-10 | Referred to Military & Local Affairs Policy (EDCA); Criminal & Civil Justice Policy Council; Criminal & Civil Justice Appropriations (CGHC); Economic Development & Community Affairs Policy Council | |
2010-01-28 | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S1004 (Similar To) 2010-07-20 - Veto Message received (2010-C) -SJ 00003; Veto Message referred to Rules -SJ 00005
S1928 (Similar To) 2010-04-30 - Died in Committee on Ethics and Elections
S1928 (Similar To) 2010-04-30 - Died in Committee on Ethics and Elections
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
0106 | 113 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
0125 | 35 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
0337 | 29 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
0843 | 08 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
0921 | 0022 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |