FL S1004 | 2010 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Vetoed on June 1 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-07-20 - Veto Message received (2010-C) -SJ 00003; Veto Message referred to Rules -SJ 00005
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Authorizes a board of county commissioners to negotiate the lease of certain real property for a limited period. Authorizes transfers of right-of-way between local governments by deed.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Local Government [EPSC]

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2010-04-28 - House - House Roll Call No. 1030 - Passage (Y: 113 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-04-21 - Senate - Senate Roll Call No. 0019 - Passage (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2010-07-20 Veto Message received (2010-C) -SJ 00003; Veto Message referred to Rules -SJ 00005
2010-06-01 Vetoed by Governor
2010-05-17 Signed by Officers and presented to Governor
2010-04-28 Ordered enrolled -SJ 00991
2010-04-28 Read 3rd time -HJ 01214; CS passed; YEAS 113 NAYS 0 -HJ 01214
2010-04-27 Placed on Special Order Calendar; Read 2nd time -HJ 01165; Substituted for CS/CS/CS/HB 829 -HJ 01165
2010-04-26 Received -HJ 01100; Referred to Calendar -HJ 01100
2010-04-22 In Messages
2010-04-21 Read 3rd time -SJ 00666; CS passed; YEAS 38 NAYS 0 -SJ 00667
2010-04-16 Placed on Special Order Calendar; Read 2nd time -SJ 00630
2010-04-15 Placed on Special Order Calendar
2010-04-09 Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading -SJ 00526
2010-04-07 Pending reference review -under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute)
2010-04-06 CS/CS by- Criminal and Civil Justice Appropriations; YEAS 4 NAYS 0 -SJ 00526; CS read 1st time on 04/08/10 -SJ 00537
2010-04-01 On Committee agenda-- Criminal and Civil Justice Appropriations, 04/06/10, 3:15 pm, 37-S
2010-03-22 Pending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute); Now in Criminal and Civil Justice Appropriations -SJ 00279
2010-03-18 CS by Judiciary; YEAS 9 NAYS 0 -SJ 00279; CS read 1st time on 03/22/10 -SJ 00284
2010-03-15 On Committee agenda-- Judiciary, 03/18/10, 1:00 pm, 110-S
2010-03-02 Introduced, referred to Community Affairs; Judiciary; Criminal Justice; Criminal and Civil Justice Appropriations -SJ 00072; On Committee agenda-- Community Affairs, 02/16/10, 10:00 am, 412-K; Favorable with 1 amendment(s) by Community Affairs (554206); YEAS 10 NAYS 0 -SJ 00163; Pending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Amendments); Original reference(s) removed: Criminal Justice; Remaining references corrected to Judiciary; Criminal and Civil Justice Appropriations -SJ 00161; Now in Judiciary -SJ 00163
2010-03-01 Original reference(s) removed: Criminal Justice; Remaining references corrected to Judiciary; Criminal and Civil Justice Appropriations; Now in Judiciary
2010-02-17 Pending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Amendments)
2010-02-16 Favorable with 1 amendment(s) by Community Affairs (554206); YEAS 10 NAYS 0
2010-02-04 On Committee agenda-- Community Affairs, 02/16/10, 10:00 am, 412-K
2010-01-14 Referred to Community Affairs; Judiciary; Criminal Justice; Criminal and Civil Justice Appropriations
2009-12-23 Filed

Same As/Similar To

H0829 (Similar To) 2010-04-27 - Placed on Special Order Calendar; Substituted CS/CS/SB 1004 (Vetoed by Governor); Laid on Table -HJ 01165

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
012535Amended CodeSee Bill Text
033729Amended CodeSee Bill Text
084308Amended CodeSee Bill Text
09210022Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.flsenate.gov/Session/index.cfm?Mode=Bills&SubMenu=1&Tab=session&BI_Mode=ViewBillInfo&BillNum=1004&Chamber=Senate&Year=2010
Texthttp://www.flsenate.gov/cgi-bin/view_page.pl?Tab=session&Submenu=1&FT=D&File=sb1004.html&Directory=session/2010/Senate/bills/billtext/html/
Texthttp://www.flsenate.gov/cgi-bin/view_page.pl?Tab=session&Submenu=1&FT=D&File=sb1004c1.html&Directory=session/2010/Senate/bills/billtext/html/
Texthttp://www.flsenate.gov/cgi-bin/view_page.pl?Tab=session&Submenu=1&FT=D&File=sb1004c2.html&Directory=session/2010/Senate/bills/billtext/html/
Texthttp://www.flsenate.gov/cgi-bin/view_page.pl?Tab=session&Submenu=1&FT=D&File=sb1004er.html&Directory=session/2010/Senate/bills/billtext/html/
Roll Callhttp://www.flsenate.gov/cgi-bin/view_page.pl?Tab=session&Submenu=1&FT=D&File=session/2010/Senate/bills/votes/html/SSB10040421100019.html
Roll Callhttp://www.flsenate.gov/cgi-bin/view_page.pl?Tab=session&Submenu=1&FT=D&File=session/2010/Senate/bills/votes/html/hSB10040428101030.html

Bill Comments

feedback