FL H0817 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 14 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-03-06 - Withdrawn prior to introduction
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 14 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-03-06 - Withdrawn prior to introduction
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizes certain preregistered voter registration applicants to vote in presidential preference primary; prohibits such persons from voting on any other race, amendment, or ballot measure on ballot; provides that such persons are not considered electors for purposes of Florida Election Code; requires supervisor of elections to generate separate precinct register containing preregistered voter registration applicants eligible to vote in presidential preference primary.
Title
Presidential Preference Primary
Sponsors
Rep. Daisy Baez [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-03-06 | House | Withdrawn prior to introduction |
2017-03-06 | House | Withdrawn from Oversight, Transparency and Administration Subcommittee; Transportation and Tourism Appropriations Subcommittee; Government Accountability Committee |
2017-02-23 | House | Referred to Oversight, Transparency and Administration Subcommittee; Transportation and Tourism Appropriations Subcommittee; Government Accountability Committee |
2017-02-14 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S0602 (Same As) 2017-05-05 - Died in Ethics and Elections
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
97 | 041 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
98 | 461 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2017/817 |
Text | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2017/0817/BillText/Filed/PDF |