FL H0813 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum:
Status: Failed on May 3 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-03 - Died in Health Policy
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]

Summary

Requires licensed facility, upon placing patient on observation status, to immediately notify patient of such status using certain forms; requires such notification to be documented in patient's medical records & discharge papers.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Hospital Observation Status

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-03-27 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#27 (Y: 113 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-03SenateDied in Health Policy
2019-05-03SenateIndefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
2019-04-04SenateReceived
2019-04-04SenateReferred to Health Policy; Appropriations Subcommittee on Health and Human Services; Appropriations
2019-04-03SenateIn Messages
2019-03-27HouseCS passed; YEAS 113 NAYS 0
2019-03-27HouseRead 3rd time
2019-03-27HousePlaced on 3rd reading
2019-03-27HouseRead 2nd time
2019-03-21HousePlaced on Special Order Calendar, 03/27/19
2019-03-14HousePlaced on Calendar
2019-03-14HouseFavorable by- Health and Human Services Committee; YEAS 16 NAYS 0
2019-03-12HouseOn Committee agenda-- Health and Human Services Committee, 03/14/19, 12:00 pm, Morris Hall
2019-03-08HouseNow in Health and Human Services Committee
2019-03-08HouseCS referred to Health and Human Services Committee
2019-03-08HouseOriginal reference(s) removed: Health Care Appropriations Subcommittee
2019-03-07HouseCS by Health Market Reform Subcommittee read 1st time
2019-03-07HousePending review of CS under Rule 7.18(c)
2019-03-07HouseCS by Health Market Reform Subcommittee; YEAS 15 NAYS 0
2019-03-05HouseOn Committee agenda-- Health Market Reform Subcommittee, 03/07/19, 9:00 am, Mashburn Hall
2019-03-05HouseIntroduced
2019-02-20HouseReferred to Health Market Reform Subcommittee; Health Care Appropriations Subcommittee; Health and Human Services Committee
2019-02-13HouseFiled

Same As/Similar To

S7078 (Similar To) 2019-04-26 - Laid on Table, refer to CS/HB 843
H843 (Similar To) 2019-06-26 - Chapter No. 2019-138

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
395301Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback