FL H0791 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Failed on May 3 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-03 - Died in Commerce and Tourism
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Failed on May 3 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-03 - Died in Commerce and Tourism
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Deletes provisions authorizing counties to impose specified taxes to pay debt service on bonds related to sports facilities; prohibits county from leasing specified professional sports franchise facilities; prohibits lease of public lands for certain purposes related to sports franchises & their facilities; requires lease of a facility on public lands for certain purposes to be at fair market value; requires sports franchise to repay specified debt incurred by local government related to construction of facilities.
Title
Sports Franchises and Facilities
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-04-11 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#57 (Y: 103 N: 13 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-03 | Senate | Died in Commerce and Tourism |
2019-05-03 | Senate | Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration |
2019-04-22 | Senate | Received |
2019-04-18 | Senate | Referred to Commerce and Tourism; Appropriations Subcommittee on Transportation, Tourism, and Economic Development; Appropriations |
2019-04-18 | Senate | In Messages |
2019-04-11 | House | Passed; YEAS 103 NAYS 13 |
2019-04-11 | House | Read 3rd time |
2019-04-10 | House | Placed on 3rd reading |
2019-04-10 | House | Read 2nd time |
2019-04-04 | House | Placed on Special Order Calendar, 04/10/19 |
2019-03-21 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2019-03-21 | House | Favorable by- Commerce Committee; YEAS 21 NAYS 0 |
2019-03-19 | House | On Committee agenda-- Commerce Committee, 03/21/19, 12:00 pm, Webster Hall |
2019-03-12 | House | Now in Commerce Committee |
2019-03-12 | House | Favorable by Ways and Means Committee; YEAS 17 NAYS 0 |
2019-03-08 | House | On Committee agenda-- Ways and Means Committee, 03/12/19, 4:00 pm, Morris Hall |
2019-03-07 | House | Now in Ways and Means Committee |
2019-03-07 | House | Favorable by Workforce Development and Tourism Subcommittee; YEAS 13 NAYS 2 |
2019-03-05 | House | On Committee agenda-- Workforce Development and Tourism Subcommittee, 03/07/19, 9:15 am, 12 HOB |
2019-03-05 | House | Introduced |
2019-02-20 | House | Referred to Workforce Development and Tourism Subcommittee; Ways and Means Committee; Commerce Committee |
2019-02-13 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H233 (Similar To) 2019-05-03 - Died in Workforce Development and Tourism Subcommittee
S414 (Similar To) 2019-05-03 - Died in Appropriations
S414 (Similar To) 2019-05-03 - Died in Appropriations
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
125 | 0104 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
125 | 35 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
212 | 0305 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
212 | 20 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
212 | 205 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
218 | 64 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
288 | 0001 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
288 | 1162 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
288 | 11621 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
288 | 11625 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
288 | 11631 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
288 | 11633 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
288 | 1171 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |