FL H0233 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Failed on May 3 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-03 - Died in Workforce Development and Tourism Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Repeals provision relating to state funding for sports facility development by unit of local government, or by certified beneficiary or other applicant, on property owned by local government.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Sports Development

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-03HouseDied in Workforce Development and Tourism Subcommittee
2019-05-03HouseIndefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
2019-03-05HouseIntroduced
2019-01-16HouseReferred to Workforce Development and Tourism Subcommittee; Ways and Means Committee; Commerce Committee
2019-01-10HouseFiled

Same As/Similar To

S414 (Same As) 2019-05-03 - Died in Appropriations
H791 (Similar To) 2019-05-03 - Died in Commerce and Tourism

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
21220Amended CodeSee Bill Text
212205Amended CodeSee Bill Text
21864Amended CodeSee Bill Text
2880001Amended CodeSee Bill Text
28811625Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback