FL H0789 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (? 2-1)
Status: Vetoed on September 18 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-09-18 - Vetoed by Governor, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/HB 787 (Ch. 2020-178)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Status: Vetoed on September 18 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-09-18 - Vetoed by Governor, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/HB 787 (Ch. 2020-178)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Provides fees for placement of specified letter on, or removal of such letter from, driver license of person who has developmental disability.
Title
Driver License Fees
Sponsors
House State Affairs Committee | House Transportation and Infrastructure Subcommittee | Rep. Josie Tomkow [R] |
Roll Calls
2020-03-11 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RCS#39 (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-09 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#620 (Y: 118 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-09 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#620 (Y: 118 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-09-18 | Vetoed by Governor, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/HB 787 (Ch. 2020-178) | |
2020-09-04 | Signed by Officers and presented to Governor | |
2020-03-11 | House | Ordered enrolled |
2020-03-11 | Senate | CS passed; YEAS 39 NAYS 0 |
2020-03-11 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2020-03-10 | Senate | Placed on 3rd reading |
2020-03-10 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2020-03-10 | Senate | Substituted for CS/CS/SB 1694 |
2020-03-10 | Senate | Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading |
2020-03-10 | Senate | Withdrawn from Infrastructure and Security; Appropriations Subcommittee on Transportation, Tourism, and Economic Development; Appropriations |
2020-03-09 | Senate | Received |
2020-03-09 | Senate | Referred to Infrastructure and Security; Appropriations Subcommittee on Transportation, Tourism, and Economic Development; Appropriations |
2020-03-09 | Senate | In Messages |
2020-03-09 | House | CS passed; YEAS 118 NAYS 0 |
2020-03-09 | House | Read 3rd time |
2020-03-06 | House | Placed on 3rd reading |
2020-03-06 | House | Read 2nd time |
2020-03-03 | House | Placed on Special Order Calendar, 03/06/20 |
2020-03-02 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2020-02-28 | House | CS/CS by State Affairs Committee read 1st time |
2020-02-28 | House | Pending review of CS -under Rule 7.18(c) |
2020-02-27 | House | CS/CS by- State Affairs Committee; YEAS 23 NAYS 0 |
2020-02-25 | House | On Committee agenda-- State Affairs Committee, 02/27/20, 8:00 am, Morris Hall |
2020-02-03 | House | Now in State Affairs Committee |
2020-02-03 | House | Favorable by Transportation and Tourism Appropriations Subcommittee; YEAS 12 NAYS 0 |
2020-01-30 | House | On Committee agenda-- Transportation and Tourism Appropriations Subcommittee, 02/03/20, 3:00 pm, Reed Hall |
2020-01-30 | House | Now in Transportation and Tourism Appropriations Subcommittee |
2020-01-29 | House | CS by Transportation and Infrastructure Subcommittee read 1st time |
2020-01-29 | House | Pending review of CS under Rule 7.18(c) |
2020-01-28 | House | CS by Transportation and Infrastructure Subcommittee; YEAS 13 NAYS 0 |
2020-01-24 | House | On Committee agenda-- Transportation and Infrastructure Subcommittee, 01/28/20, 12:00 pm, Reed Hall |
2020-01-14 | House | Introduced |
2019-12-16 | House | Referred to Transportation and Infrastructure Subcommittee; Transportation and Tourism Appropriations Subcommittee; State Affairs Committee |
2019-11-26 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H787 (Related) 2020-09-21 - Chapter No. 2020-178
S1694 (Same As) 2020-03-10 - Laid on Table, refer to CS/CS/HB 789
S1692 (Similar To) 2020-03-10 - Laid on Table, refer to CS/CS/HB 787
S1694 (Same As) 2020-03-10 - Laid on Table, refer to CS/CS/HB 789
S1692 (Similar To) 2020-03-10 - Laid on Table, refer to CS/CS/HB 787