FL H0789 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on April 28 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-04-28 - Died in Business and Professions Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on April 28 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-04-28 - Died in Business and Professions Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Defines term "regulatory minimum price"; provides that establishment of regulatory minimum prices for lawful goods or services, or creation of service classifications that would apply differently to certain individuals & businesses is an unfair or deceptive regulatory act; requires DACS to identify instances of regulatory minimum prices & notify noncompliant agencies or entities; clarifies that act does not apply to minimum wages & regulatory fees of governmental entity; provides relief for persons who are adversely affected by certain regulatory actions; requires courts to award reasonable fees, costs, & damages; provides limitation on damages; requires certain interest on sums awarded.
Title
Regulatory Minimum Prices
Sponsors
Rep. John Tobia [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-04-28 | House | Died in Business and Professions Subcommittee |
2015-03-03 | House | Introduced |
2015-02-26 | House | Referred to Business and Professions Subcommittee; Agriculture and Natural Resources Appropriations Subcommittee; Regulatory Affairs Committee |
2015-02-17 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S0990 (Similar To) 2015-05-01 - Died in Regulated Industries
Code Citations
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2015/789 |
Text | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2015/0789/BillText/Filed/PDF |