FL H0783 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on March 10 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-10 - Died in Commerce Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on March 10 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-10 - Died in Commerce Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Provides requirements & procedures for notification to administrative entities; consolidated application & material changes to application; restrictions for entrance fees, reservation deposits, & release of escrow moneys; submission & review of applications for simultaneous acquisition of facility & issuance of certificate of authority; monthly & quarterly statements filed with office by providers & facilities; withdrawals from escrow accounts; financial & operating requirements for providers; minimum liquid reserve requirements; approval of change in third-party management; examination & inspections; grounds for discretionary denial, suspension, or revocation of certificate of authority; delinquency proceedings; immediate suspension orders; cease and desist orders; & criminal penalties & injunctive relief.
Title
Continuing Care Contracts
Sponsors
House Health and Human Services Committee | House Insurance and Banking Subcommittee | Rep. James Grant [R] | Rep. Sean Shaw [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-10 | House | Died in Commerce Committee |
2018-03-10 | House | Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration |
2018-02-19 | House | CS/CS by Health and Human Services Committee read 1st time |
2018-02-19 | House | Now in Commerce Committee |
2018-02-16 | House | Pending review of CS under Rule 7.18(c) |
2018-02-15 | House | CS/CS by Health and Human Services Committee; YEAS 19 NAYS 0 |
2018-02-13 | House | On Committee agenda-- Health and Human Services Committee, 02/15/18, 8:30 am, Morris Hall |
2018-02-05 | House | Now in Health and Human Services Committee |
2018-02-02 | House | CS by Insurance and Banking Subcommittee read 1st time |
2018-02-02 | House | Pending review of CS under Rule 7.18(c) |
2018-01-30 | House | CS by Insurance and Banking Subcommittee; YEAS 12 NAYS 0 |
2018-01-26 | House | On Committee agenda-- Insurance and Banking Subcommittee, 01/30/18, 3:30 pm, Sumner Hall |
2018-01-09 | House | Introduced |
2017-12-08 | House | Referred to Insurance and Banking Subcommittee; Health and Human Services Committee; Commerce Committee |
2017-11-21 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S438 (Similar To) 2018-03-10 - Died in Rules
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
415 | 1055 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
451 | 1055 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
651 | 011 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
651 | 012 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
651 | 013 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
651 | 019 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
651 | 021 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
651 | 0215 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
651 | 022 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
651 | 023 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
651 | 024 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
651 | 0245 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
651 | 0246 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
651 | 026 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
651 | 0261 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
651 | 028 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
651 | 033 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
651 | 034 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
651 | 035 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
651 | 043 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
651 | 051 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
651 | 057 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
651 | 071 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
651 | 091 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
651 | 105 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
651 | 1055 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
651 | 106 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
651 | 1065 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
651 | 111 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
651 | 114 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
651 | 1141 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
651 | 121 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
651 | 125 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |