FL H0777 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Failed on May 3 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-03 - Died in Business and Professional Regulation Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Failed on May 3 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-03 - Died in Business and Professional Regulation Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Requires retailers & manufacturers to disclose efforts to identify & eradicate human trafficking, slavery, & exploitive labor from supply chains; requires retailers & manufacturers to post such disclosure on retailer's or manufacturer's website or provide written disclosure; provides minimum requirements for disclosure; provides for injunctive relief or divestment of state funds for violation; provides for applicability; requires DOR to submit annual report to Governor & Legislature.
Title
Exploitive Labor
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-05-03 | House | Died in Business and Professional Regulation Subcommittee |
2013-03-05 | House | Introduced |
2013-02-28 | House | Referred to Business and Professional Regulation Subcommittee; Civil Justice Subcommittee; Finance and Tax Subcommittee; Regulatory Affairs Committee |
2013-02-13 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H1309 (Similar To) 2013-06-10 - Chapter No. 2013-154
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2013/777 |
Text | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2013/0777/BillText/Filed/PDF |