FL H0771 | 2022 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on November 30 2021 - 25% progression
Action: 2022-01-11 - 1st Reading (Original Filed Version)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Requires Florida Building Commission to develop certain uniform standards for existing building structures or facilities; provides requirements for such standards; authorizes commission to adopt certain rules that deviate from statewide standards.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Powers of the Florida Building Commission

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2022-01-11House1st Reading (Original Filed Version)
2021-12-13HouseNow in Regulatory Reform Subcommittee
2021-12-13HouseReferred to Commerce Committee
2021-12-13HouseReferred to State Administration & Technology Appropriations Subcommittee
2021-12-13HouseReferred to Regulatory Reform Subcommittee
2021-11-30HouseFiled

Same As/Similar To

S1604 (Similar To) 2022-01-12 - Referred to Community Affairs; Regulated Industries; Rules

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
55377Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback